Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/18/2019 at 04:32:18 (UTC).

Reenu Saini vs Rod Buckley

Case Summary

On 06/30/2016 Reenu Saini filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Rod Buckley. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Yep, Steven L, Lin, Wen-Ching, Stoelker, James L, Zayner, Theodore C and Copeland, Christine. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5293

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Yep, Steven L

Lin, Wen-Ching

Stoelker, James L

Zayner, Theodore C

Copeland, Christine

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Saini, Reenu

Defendant

Buckley, Rod

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lin, Wen-Ching; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Saini, Reenu; Awarded Against: Buckley, Rod; Amount; Damages: $4,280.25; Costs: $50.00; Total: $4330.25; Party: Names: Saini, Reenu; Buckley, Rod

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Copeland, Christine; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Saini, Reenu; Awarded Against: Buckley, Rod; Amount; Damages: $4,192.75; Costs: $50.00; Total: $4242.75; Comment: ***Judg't Notice mailed to parties on 10/12/16.***No courtroom Clerk present. Notice of Jdgmnt mailed to Def's. POB.; Party: Names: Saini, Reenu; Buckley, Rod

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • Hearing: Motion hearings - Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Lin, Wen-Ching; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Held; Comment: continued by the court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Yep, Steven L; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Not Held; Comment: Trial Continued by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • Hearing: Motion hearings - Judicial Officer: Stoelker, James L; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • Motion to Vacate - Small Claims

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2016
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Copeland, Christine; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • Proof of Service: Personal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$1,501 to $5,000

    Read MoreRead Less