This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 12:30:06 (UTC).

Reed Larsen vs CSAA Insurance Group

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 Reed Larsen filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CSAA Insurance Group. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Colistra, John and Copeland, Christine. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2561

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Colistra, John

Copeland, Christine

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Larsen, Reed

Defendant

CSAA Insurance Group

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Copeland, Christine; Judgment Type: Small Claims Dismissal - other (SC); Comment: Comment (Dismissed in court without prejudice; no appearance by plaintiff.); Party: Names: Larsen, Reed; CSAA Insurance Group

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Copeland, Christine; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Continued from 03/27/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • Judgment: Notice of Entry (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Colistra, John; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Fees paid $90.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • Order - Comment: It is noted that the parties do not stipulate to the JPT(Judge Pro Tem) in D14, where this matter was originally scheduled. In addition, the court Commissioner in D15 must disqualify herself from judging this case. The Court continues this matter to another Non-Stip trial calendar.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Subpoena for personal appearance and production of Documents and things at trial or Hearing and Declaration.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • Proof of Service: Personal - Comment: Proof of Service Civil Subpoena

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • Returned/Undeliverable Mail - Comment: Certified card received detached from certified envelope.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Service by clerk for certified mail, to each defendant - Comment: #70170530000076919133.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$5,001 to $10,000

    Read MoreRead Less