This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/20/2019 at 07:04:02 (UTC).

Rebello's Towing Services Inc. vs Byron Griffie

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 Rebello's Towing Services Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Byron Griffie. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Copeland, Christine. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5957

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Copeland, Christine

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rebello's Towing Services Inc.

Defendant

Griffie, Byron

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2019
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Copeland, Christine; Judgment Type: Small Claims Dismissal - other (SC); Comment: Comment (Per Minute Order case is dismissed without prejudice.); Party: Names: Rebello's Towing Services Inc.; Griffie, Byron

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • Proof of Service - Comment: POS on: Notice of Case Dismissal / Minute Order.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Copeland, Christine; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Fees Paid: $50.00 No POS as of 05/29/19.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Copeland, Christine; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Fees Paid: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Request: Postponement (Small Claims) (No Fee) - Comment: reset

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Plaintiff's Claim (Amended) (No change in no claim amount)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • Request: Postponement (Small Claims) (No Fee) - Comment: reset requested by plt.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Copeland, Christine; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Paid $ 50.00. No POS as of 11/28/18.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$1,501 to $5,000

    Read MoreRead Less