This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 14:39:06 (UTC).

Rebecca White vs Crisha Zamora Amistad

Case Summary

On 01/25/2016 Rebecca White filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Crisha Zamora Amistad. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Elfving, William J, Stoelker, James L, Strickland, Elizabeth, Kulkarni, Sunil R and Takaichi, Drew C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0725

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Elfving, William J

Stoelker, James L

Strickland, Elizabeth

Kulkarni, Sunil R

Takaichi, Drew C

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

White, Rebecca

Garzon Rojas, Laura

Gawergious Magar, Jessica Emil

Horn, Morgan

Defendants

Zamora Amistad, Crisha Marie

Amistad, Confucius

Waste Connection of California Inc.

Gomez, Robert Ruben, Jr.

Lugo, Edmundo

IESI Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Dougan, Stephen J.

Makkabi, David Fareid

Caputo, Paul Francis

Van Der Walde, Paul D.

Defendant Attorneys

Stock, David J.

Wilcox, Wendy Leigh

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2019
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Kulkarni, Sunil R; Judgment Type: Dismissal - After Court-Ordered Mediation (CV); Party: Names: White, Rebecca; Zamora Amistad, Crisha Marie; Waste Connection of California Inc.; IESI Corporation; Gomez, Robert Ruben, Jr.; Lugo, Edmundo; Amistad, Confucius; Gawergious Magar, Jessica Emil; Garzon Rojas, Laura; Horn, Morgan; Comment: entire with prejudice by atty Ruiz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: partial with prejudice by atty Van Der Walde as to the Complaint only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • Hearing: Dismissal after settlement - Judicial Officer: Kulkarni, Sunil R; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS - Comment: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: entire with prejudice by atty Ruiz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS - Comment: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: partial with prejudice by atty Dougan as to the Complaint of Rebecca White only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Review: Mediation Status - Judicial Officer: Kulkarni, Sunil R; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Sesson w/Craig Needham 1/23/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • Notice - Comment: Notice of Change of Responsible Attorney Within Firm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • Mediation Held - Comment: settled

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 05/23/2016
  • Statement: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2016
  • Notice - Comment: of intent to appear by telephone

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2016
  • Statement: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • Clerk Rejection Letter - Comment: Case management statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • Demand: Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: to complaint Atty Ozowski

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less