This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 12:32:14 (UTC).

Rebecca Moradian et al vs General Motors LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 Rebecca Moradian filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against General Motors LLC. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Stoelker, James L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1870

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Stoelker, James L

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Moradian, Rebecca

Moradian, Zhourzh

Defendants

Moore Buick Corporation

General Motors LLC

Moore Buick Pontiac GMC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lovasz, Christopher M.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Stoelker, James L; Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Names: Moradian, Rebecca; Moradian, Zhourzh; General Motors LLC; Moore Buick Corporation; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • Hearing: Dismissal after settlement - Judicial Officer: Stoelker, James L; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Conference: Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Case Management; Judicial Officer: Stoelker, James L; Hearing Time: 2:15 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Notice: Ruling - Comment: Notice of Ruling Regarding Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable) - Comment: $150 jury fees paid by Atty. Lovasz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less