This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 16:50:42 (UTC).

RBT Construction Inc. vs V. Phuong

Case Summary

On 07/13/2010 RBT Construction Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against V Phuong. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Townsend, Jeffrey and Zepeda, Carrie. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************0452

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Townsend, Jeffrey

Zepeda, Carrie

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rbt Construction Inc.

2915 Tobin Drive

San Jose, CA 95132

Defendants

Vivo Phuong

San Jose, CA 95126

Phuong, Vivo

La Belle European Day Spas

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2010
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Phuong, Vivo; Party: Name: RBT Construction Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2010
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Phuong, Vivo; Comment: dispositiveflag=NO;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: RBT Construction Inc.; Comment: dispositiveflag=NO;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: RBT Construction Inc.; Judgment Amount: $1,060.00; And Attorney Fees: $0.00; Awarded Against: Phuong, Vivo; Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Costs: $60.00; Other: $1,000.00; Total: $1060.00; Comment: printdate=Nov 12 2010; freetext=It is ordered, adjuged and decreed that Judgment is rendered as follows: for RBT Construction Inc. recover from Phuong, Vivo DBA La Belle European $1,000.00 plus $60.00 in costs for a total Judgment of $1,060.00- The Appellant, having faile; origjudgdate=Nov 12 2010; judgstatusdate=Nov 12 2010; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2010
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Townsend, Jeffrey; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Phuong, Vivo; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: RBT Construction Inc.; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: RBT Construction Inc.; Judgment Amount: $1,060.00; And Attorney Fees: $0.00; Awarded Against: Phuong, Vivo; Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Costs: $60.00; Other: $1,000.00; Total: $1060.00; Comment: clerkid=275; printdate=Sep 24 2010; freetext=Defendant shall pay plaintiff $1,000.00 principal and $60.00 costs on plaintiff's claim. Total judgment $1,060.00; origjudgdate=Sep 1 2010; judgstatusdate=Sep 24 2010; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2010
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Phuong, Vivo; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: RBT Construction Inc.; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2010
  • Certificate of Mailing - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = Order on Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment (Filed dated 11/18/10) Legacy Name = SC Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2010
  • Order - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = The request is denied. The case was appealed thus the decision was made at the trial de novo. Legacy Name = SC Ord:Req to Correct or Cancel Decision = M Closed = 11/18/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2010
  • Trial De Novo - Original Type: Trial De Novo; Judicial Officer: Zepeda, Carrie; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Result: Heard: Judgment; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = CZ - Zepeda, Carrie Result Date = 11/12/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2010
  • Clerk's Notice - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SCA-Ntc:Transfer of SC Matter Decision = M Closed = 11/12/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2010
  • Judgment - Judicial Officer: Zepeda, Carrie; Comment: Text = It is ordered, adjuged and decreed that Judgment is rendered as follows: for RBT Construction Inc. recover from Phuong, Vivo DBA La Belle European $1,000.00 plus $60.00 in costs for a total Judgment of $1,060.00- The Appellant, having failed to appear, the appeal is DISMISSED by Judge Carrie Zepeda Legacy Name = CV Judgment Decision = M Closed = 11/12/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2010
  • Request: Court Order (Small Claims) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Req:Court Order & Answer Decision = M Closed = 10/06/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2010
  • Clerk's Notice - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SCA-Ntc of SC Appeal Trial Decision = M Closed = 09/29/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2010
  • Request to Correct or Vacate Judgment - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Req:Correct/Vacate Jgmt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2010
  • Notice: Appeal (Small Claims) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Ntc of Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2010
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Heard: Judgment; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = JT - Townsend, Jeffrey Result Date = 09/01/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2010
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Decl:Authority to Represent Decision = M Closed = 09/27/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2010
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = by certified mail Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2010
  • Cause Of Action - Action Complaint; File Date: 07/13/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2010
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$1,501 to $5,000 - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = claim amount $4128.00 Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim $1501-$5000 Decision = M Closed = 07/13/2010

    Read MoreRead Less