This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 19:50:39 (UTC).

Ray Barrera vs Pro-Sweep, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 Ray Barrera filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Pro-Sweep, Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth, Stoelker, James L, Kulkarni, Sunil R and Arand, Mary E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6086

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Stoelker, James L

Kulkarni, Sunil R

Arand, Mary E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Barrera, Ray

Claimant

City of San Jose

Defendants

Luna, Emilio

Pro-Sweep, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nelsen, Robert Michael

Claimant Attorney

Richardson, Nkia D.

Defendant Attorneys

Miller, R James

Intrieri, Mark Gregory

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Review: Mediation Status - Original Type: Review: Mediation Status; Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Plaintiff's CMC Statment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Review: Mediation Status - Judicial Officer: Kulkarni, Sunil R; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Review: Civil Early Settlement Conf Status - Original Type: Review: Civil Early Settlement Conf Status; Judicial Officer: Stoelker, James L; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Neutral Pending.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Referral: Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Substitution: Attorney - Comment: Old: Fakhimi New: Miller

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: HRG 12.20.18 Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 06/27/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Hrg: 07/17/18 2:15pm D13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable) - Comment: $150 PAID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: to Complaint; Atty Intrieri

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: to Complaint; Atty Miller

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Emilio Luna

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: POS Summons and Complaint - Pro-Sweep, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • Notice: Lien Claimant - Comment: Claimant: City of San Jose. $2,163.03

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less