Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 09/25/2019 at 10:08:58 (UTC).

Ralph Molano vs Kazuyuki Nemoto

Case Summary

On 07/27/2018 Ralph Molano filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Kazuyuki Nemoto. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3041

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Molano, Ralph

Respondent

Nemoto, Kazuyuki

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Reyes, Gemma Victoria

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2019
  • FC 2336 Packet Received for Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • Request: Enter Default - Comment: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed - Comment: Amended Proof of Service of Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Comment: Proof of Service: Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Declaration: Property - Comment: Amended (p) com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • Request: Enter Default - Comment: Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Declaration: Property - Comment: (p) sep

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Declaration: Property - Comment: (p) com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Request: Enter Default - Comment: Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 11/28/2018
  • Request: Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Declaration: Property - Comment: separate - ptr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Request: Enter Default - Comment: Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • Declaration: Income and Expense - Comment: Income and Expense Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary) - Comment: Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • Acknowledgement/Receipt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Petition: Dissolution no minor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Petition: Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less