This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 12:29:06 (UTC).

Rajiv Dhiman vs Shilpa Arora

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 Rajiv Dhiman filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Shilpa Arora. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Hayashi, Roberta S. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0161

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Hayashi, Roberta S

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Dhiman, Rajiv

Respondent

Arora, Shilpa

Minor

Dhiman, Rhea

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Pagan, Chelsea Armer

Smith, Heather Jane Sheph

Respondent Attorney

Azzolino, Gina

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2019
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Hayashi, Roberta S; Judgment Type: Judgment/order (FL); Party: Names: Dhiman, Rajiv; Arora, Shilpa; Dhiman, Rhea

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • Custody Settlement Conf - Judicial Officer: Hayashi, Roberta S; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Comment: set by agree on 3/27 bw.,cont per s/o azzolino

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • Conference: Status - Judicial Officer: Hayashi, Roberta S; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: per s/o azzolino: parties stip to adv EEO. bw.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Proof of Service: Electronic - Comment: Proof of Service: Electronic; Stip and Order to Continue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Stipulation and Order - Comment: cont custody set conf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • Proof of Service: Personal - Comment: Proof of Service: Personal; R's Eval Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • Findings & Order After Hearing - Comment: hrg 3/27/19 cont to 6/17/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • Settlement Officer Conf - Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Orders Issued; Comment: Smith 5/7 by agreement. Requesting Ed Mills to handle soc.-lv

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • Stipulation & Order - No Fee - Comment: Divisions of Community Property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Proof of Service: Electronic - Comment: Proof of Service: Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
77 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2018
  • Responsive Declaration to Request for Order - Comment: ex parte resp dec

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • Substitution: Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • Response: Dissolution - Comment: FL-120

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction Enforcement Act - Comment: amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Comment: amended summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • Petition: Amended - Comment: 1st amended petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less