This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/11/2022 at 15:53:47 (UTC).

Radiance Technologies, Inc. vs Austiaj Limited Partnership Fund II, A Calif. Limited Partnership

Case Summary

On 02/22/2008 Radiance Technologies, Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Austiaj Limited Partnership Fund II, A Calif Limited Partnership. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************5110

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Radiance Technologies, Inc.

Defendant

Austiaj Limited Partnership Fund Ii, A Calif. Limited Partnership

Not Yet Classified

Richard C Sinclair

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2008
  • DocketDescription: Judgment: Satisfaction; Filed By: Radiance Technologies, Inc.,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Acknowledge Satisfaction of Jgmt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2008
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's Notice; Comment: Legacy Name = SCA-Ntc:Transfer of SC Matter Decision = M Closed = 06/26/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2008
  • DocketDescription: Order: Submitted Matter; Filed By: Radiance Technologies, Inc., Austiaj Limited Partnership Fund II, A Calif. Limited Partnership,; Comment: Text = radiance technologies, inc. to recover from autaij limited partnership fund II $5000.00 plus $60.00 in costs for a total judgment of $5060.00 Legacy Name = Order on Submitted Matter Decision = M Closed = 06/26/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2008
  • DocketDescription: Judgment; Filed By: Radiance Technologies, Inc., Austiaj Limited Partnership Fund II, A Calif. Limited Partnership,; Comment: Text = radiance technologies, inc. to recover from autaij limited partnership fund II $5000.00 plus $60.00 in costs for a total judgment of $5060.00 Legacy Name = CV Judgment Decision = M Closed = 06/26/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2008
  • HearingDescription: Trial De Novo; Department: Department 22; Time: 8:45AM; Result: Heard: Taken Under Submission

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2008
  • HearingDescription: Trial De Novo; Department: Department 22; Time: 8:45AM; Result: Continued: Current Month

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2008
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's Notice; Comment: Legacy Name = SCA-Ntc of Resched SC Trial Decision = M Closed = 05/21/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2008
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's Notice; Comment: Legacy Name = SCA-Ntc of SC Appeal Trial Decision = M Closed = 05/13/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2008
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Appeal (Small Claims); Filed By: Austiaj Limited Partnership Fund II, A Calif. Limited Partnership,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Ntc of Appeal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2008
  • HearingDescription: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Department: Department 86; Time: 1:00PM; Result: Heard: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2008
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: Richard Sinclair,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2008
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2008
  • DocketDescription: Plaintiff's Claim-$1,501 to $5,000; Filed By: Radiance Technologies, Inc.,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim $1501-$5000 Decision = M Closed = 04/11/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less