Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/16/2019 at 17:59:21 (UTC).

Rachel Elegiry and Islam Elegiry

Case Summary

On 05/18/2015 Rachel Elegiry and Islam Elegiry was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Grilli, Mary Ann. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************4639

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Grilli, Mary Ann

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rachel Elegiry

Mountain View, CA 94043

Petitioner

Elegiry, Rachel

Defendant

Islam Elegiry

Respondent

Elegiry, Islam

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Grilli, Mary Ann; Judgment Type: Judgment/order (FL); Party: Names: Elegiry, Rachel; Elegiry, Islam

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • Notice: Entry of Judgment w/POS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • Judgment: Dissolution/FC2336

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • Declaration: Default Judgment/Uncontested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • FC 2336 Packet Received for Review - Comment: Legacy Name = FL-SYVL 2336 Packet Received for Review Decision = G Closed = 12/21/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary) - Judicial Officer: Grilli, Mary Ann; Comment: Text = personal svc Legacy Name = FL Decl:Svc of Preliminary Decl/Discl Decision = M Closed = 11/04/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • FC 2336 Packet Received for Review - Judicial Officer: Grilli, Mary Ann; Comment: Legacy Name = FL-SYVL 2336 Packet Received for Review Decision = D Closed = 10/01/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure - Judicial Officer: Grilli, Mary Ann; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Stip/Waiver:Final Decl of Disclosure Decision = M Closed = 08/24/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • Appearance Stipulation & Waiver - Judicial Officer: Grilli, Mary Ann; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Appear/Stip/Waiver Decision = M Closed = 08/24/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • Proof of Service: Personal - Judicial Officer: Grilli, Mary Ann; Comment: Text = Response Legacy Name = FL Proof of Personal Svc Decision = M Closed = 08/24/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2015
  • Response: Dissolution - Judicial Officer: Grilli, Mary Ann; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Response DS/NL/LS Decision = M Closed = 08/24/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • Request: Enter Default - Judicial Officer: Grilli, Mary Ann; Comment: Text = withdrawn by petitioner Legacy Name = FL-SYVL Req: Entry of Default Decision = M Closed = 07/28/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • Declaration: Income and Expense - Judicial Officer: Grilli, Mary Ann; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Income/Expense Decl Decision = M Closed = 07/28/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Final) - Judicial Officer: Grilli, Mary Ann; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Service of Final Decl/Discl Decision = M Closed = 07/28/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed - Judicial Officer: Grilli, Mary Ann; Comment: Text = ADR Options, Family Law Notice Legacy Name = FL Proof of Svc/Summons Decision = M Closed = 05/20/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) - Judicial Officer: Grilli, Mary Ann; Comment: Legacy Name = Order on Court Fee Waiver Decision = G Closed = 05/18/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • Request to Waive Court Fees (FW-001) - Judicial Officer: Grilli, Mary Ann; Comment: Legacy Name = Req to Waive Court Fees Decision = M Closed = 05/18/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Grilli, Mary Ann; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Summons Decision = M Closed = 05/18/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • Petition: Dissolution no minor - Judicial Officer: Grilli, Mary Ann; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Petn:Dissol of Marriage/No minor Decision = M Closed = 05/18/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • Declaration: Residence - Judicial Officer: Grilli, Mary Ann; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl of Residence Decision = M Closed = 05/18/2015

    Read MoreRead Less