This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/19/2022 at 18:03:50 (UTC).

R. Spieker et al vs Rosalba Zendejas et al

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 R Spieker filed an Other lawsuit against Rosalba Zendejas. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2778

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

San Jose Facility - Civil

Not Yet Classified

CATHERINE R. SPIEKER

CHRISTIAN GUITERREZ

Todd R Spieker

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Todd B. Rothbard

 

Court Documents

Notice: Appeal (Limited) - Up To $10K

1/18/2022 Notice: Appeal (Limited) - Up To $10K

Order

2/1/2022 Order

Record on Appeal

2/18/2022 Record on Appeal

Order

2/24/2022 Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order; Filed By: CHRISTIAN GUITERREZ,; Comment: Dismissing Appeal - signed by Judges Williams, Zepeda, and Emede (envelope #8363715)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Record on Appeal; Filed By: CHRISTIAN GUITERREZ,; Comment: Abbreviated record

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order; Filed By: CHRISTIAN GUITERREZ,; Comment: Order Construing Notice of Appeal as from the Judgment - signed by Judges Williams, Zepeda, & Emede (mailed 2-1-22)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Appeal (Limited) - Up To $10K; Comment: Envelope #8079554 & Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Receipt: Clerk's Transcript

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where San Jose Facility - Civil is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rothbard, Todd B.