This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/28/2018 at 04:22:36 (UTC).

R. Miller vs B. Williams

Case Summary

On 12/15/2005 R Miller filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against B Williams. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Golden, John J, Cabrinha, Neal A and Madden, James P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************3039

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Golden, John J

Cabrinha, Neal A

Madden, James P

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Roger Miller

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Miller, Roger

Defendants

Barbara Williams

Williams, Barbara

Palo Alto Hearing Air Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Martin R. Deutsch

440 North First Street, Suite 200

San Jose, CA 95112

Deutsch, Martin R.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2006
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Williams, Barbara; Party: Name: Miller, Roger

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2006
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Williams, Barbara; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Miller, Roger; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Miller, Roger; Judgment Amount: $1,668.50; And Attorney Fees: $0.00; Awarded Against: Williams, Barbara; Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Costs: $68.50; Other: $1,600.00; Total: $1668.50; Comment: printdate=Mar 21 2006; origjudgdate=Mar 20 2006; judgstatusdate=Mar 21 2006; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2005
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Williams, Barbara; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Miller, Roger; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2006
  • Clerk's Notice - Judicial Officer: Golden, John J; Comment: Text = with notice returned to small claims court. Legacy Name = SCA-Ntc:Transfer of SC Matter Decision = M Closed = 05/10/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2006
  • Trial De Novo - Original Type: Trial De Novo; Judicial Officer: Cabrinha, Neal A; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Heard: Judgment; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = NAC - Cabrinha, Neal Result Date = 05/09/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2006
  • Judgment - Judicial Officer: Golden, John J; Comment: Text = Roger Miller recover from Barbara Williams DBA Palo Alto Housing Center $1,600.00 plus $68.50 in costs for a total judgment of $1,668.50. Legacy Name = CV Judgment Decision = M Closed = 05/10/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2006
  • Clerk's Notice - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SCA-Ntc of SC Appeal Trial Decision = M Closed = 04/19/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2006
  • Notice: Appeal (Small Claims) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Ntc of Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2006
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard: Judgment; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = JM - Madden, James Result Date = 03/20/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2006
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued: Court; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = JM - Madden, James Result Date = 01/23/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2005
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2005
  • Cause Of Action - Action Complaint; File Date: 12/15/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2005
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$1,500 or Less - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff's Claim/<13,non-Gov Closed = 01/23/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Deutsch, Martin Robert