This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/20/2018 at 12:10:34 (UTC).

R. Cipriano, et al vs C. Phan

Case Summary

On 12/16/2014 R Cipriano filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against C Phan. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Overton, Carol, Zayner, Theodore C, Stoelker, James L, Folan, Maureen A and Strickland, Elizabeth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************4530

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Overton, Carol

Zayner, Theodore C

Stoelker, James L

Folan, Maureen A

Strickland, Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Rey Cipriano

Melissa Creps

Leticia De Venegas Lopez

Jose Lopez

Nelly Lopez

Cipriano, Rey

De Venegas Lopez, Leticia

Lopez, Nelly

Creps, Melissa

Lopez, Jose

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Canh Dinh Phan

Phan, Canh Dinh

Ma, Phi

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Joseph S. Tobener

21 Masonic Avenue, Suite A

San Francisco, CA 94118

Vanderdrift, Luke

Lucey, James W.

Tobener, Joseph S.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Wilson, Jeffrey P.

Thacker, Todd Marshall

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Judgment Type: Dismissal - After Court-Ordered Mediation (CV); Party: Names: Cipriano, Rey; Creps, Melissa; De Venegas Lopez, Leticia; Lopez, Jose; Lopez, Nelly; Phan, Canh Dinh; Ma, Phi; Comment: with prejudice by attys Lucey and Ebstein

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Judgment Type: Dismissal - After Court-Ordered Mediation (CV); Party: Names: Cipriano, Rey; Creps, Melissa; De Venegas Lopez, Leticia; Lopez, Jose; Lopez, Nelly; Comment: partial without prejudice by atty Lucey as to def Thi Nguyen only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • Hearing: Dismissal after settlement - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • Other - Comment: Dismissal hearing statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • Jury Trial: Long Cause - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Est. 7 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • Stipulation and Order - Comment: To Temporary Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2016
  • Conference: Settlement Jury - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Judge Pro Tem Phil Young, D-8 Jury Room

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • Statement: Settlement Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • Statement: Settlement Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2015
  • Notice of Hearing (no fee) - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Comment: Legacy Name = ARB-Ntc of Mediation Status Conf Decision = M Closed = 04/15/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2015
  • Conference: Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Case Management; Judicial Officer: Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Result: Referral: Mediation; Comment: Text = COURT CALL BY: Contact: Luke T. VanderDrift For Plaintiff(s), Cipriano, et al Contact: Jeffrey P. Wilson For Defendant(s), Canh Dinh Phan Result By = C Result Judge = ES4 - Strickland, Elizabeth Result Date = 04/14/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Comment: Text = j. wilson Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement Decision = M Closed = 04/10/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2015
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Comment: Text = Atty VanderDrift Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement Decision = M Closed = 03/30/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2015
  • Demand: Jury Trial - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Comment: Text = Atty Wilson Legacy Name = CV Demand for Jury Trial Decision = M Closed = 02/26/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2015
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Comment: Text = Atty Wilson Legacy Name = CV Answer, Unltd, w/fees Decision = M Closed = 02/26/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2015
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 01/21/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2014
  • Jury Fee Deposit - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Jury Fee Deposit Decision = M Closed = 12/16/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2014
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued Decision = M Closed = 12/16/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 12/16/2014

    Read MoreRead Less