This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/20/2019 at 05:24:53 (UTC).

Q.V. Quince Homeowner's Association vs D. Ferrari, et al

Case Summary

On 07/28/2010 Q filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Quince Homeowner's Association. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Steingart, Lisa and Draa, Tyler. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************0637

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Steingart, Lisa

Draa, Tyler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Q.V. Quince Homeowner'S Association

895 Quince Ave, Unit # 3

Santa Clara, CA 95051

Defendants

David Michael Ferrari

Pleasanton, CA 94566

Rebecca Ferrari

Pleasanton, CA 94566

Ferrari, David Michael

Ferrari, Rebecca

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2010
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Party: Name: Ferrari, Rebecca; Party: Name: Ferrari, David Michael; Party: Name: Q.V. Quince Homeowner's Association

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2010
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Draa, Tyler; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Party: Name: Ferrari, Rebecca; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Ferrari, David Michael; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Q.V. Quince Homeowner's Association; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Q.V. Quince Homeowner's Association; Judgment Amount: $1,691.00; And Attorney Fees: $0.00; Awarded Against: Ferrari, David Michael; Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Costs: $185.00; Other: $1,506.00; Total: $1691.00; Comment: clerkid=588; printdate=Sep 29 2010; freetext=Defendant shall pay plaintiff $1506.00 principal and $185.00 costs on plaintiff's claim.; origjudgdate=Sep 27 2010; judgstatusdate=Sep 29 2010; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2010
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Party: Name: Ferrari, Rebecca; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Ferrari, David Michael; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Q.V. Quince Homeowner's Association; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2011
  • Writ: Execution (Filed) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = Santa Clara issued 12/17/10 $17.09 deficit Legacy Name = SC Writ of Exec/Rtn Partially Satis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2011
  • Hearing: Order of Examination - Original Type: Hearing: Order of Examination; Judicial Officer: Steingart, Lisa; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Off Calendar by court; Comment: Text = No appearance. Result By = C Result Judge = CC2 - Copeland, Christine Result Date = 01/10/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2010
  • Writ: Execution (Issued) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = santa clara $ 1716.00 Legacy Name = SC Writ of Exec

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2010
  • Application: Order of Examination - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Appl/Ord:Appearance/Exam

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2010
  • Application: Order of Examination - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Appl/Ord:Appearance/Exam

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2010
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard: Default Judgment; Comment: Text = Defendant shall pay plaintiff $1506.00 principal and $185.00 costs on plaintiff's claim. Result By = C Result Judge = TD1 - Draa, Tyler Result Date = 09/27/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2010
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Decl:Authority to Represent Decision = M Closed = 09/29/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2010
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = subserv david michael ferrari Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2010
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = subserv rebecca ferrari Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2010
  • Cause Of Action - Action Complaint; File Date: 07/28/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2010
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$1,501 to $5,000 - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = claim amount $1737.00 Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim $1501-$5000 Decision = M Closed = 07/28/2010

    Read MoreRead Less