This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 12:47:11 (UTC).

Quilici Engineers vs Gary De Vilbiss

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 Quilici Engineers filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Gary De Vilbiss. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Dalesandro, Jil. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5955

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Dalesandro, Jil

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Quilici Engineers

Defendant

De Vilbiss, Gary

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Request for Dismissal (PR, SC); Comment: Comment (Plt filed dismissal without prejudice.); Party: Names: Quilici Engineers; De Vilbiss, Gary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Jil; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Paid $ 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Request: Dismissal, Entire Action Without Prejudice - Comment: Plt filed dismissal without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • Proof of Service: Personal - Comment: 10/12/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$1,501 to $5,000

    Read MoreRead Less