This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 12:48:13 (UTC).

Qingzhi Wu et al vs Chris Franks et al

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 Qingzhi Wu filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Chris Franks. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Smith, Irene. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5960

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Smith, Irene

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Wu, Qingzhi

Hageman, Charles

Defendants

Franks, Chris

Franks, Lynn

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Judgment Type: Small Claims Dismissal - other (SC); Party: Names: Wu, Qingzhi; Hageman, Charles; Franks, Chris; Franks, Lynn; Comment: Plaintiff filed dismissal without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Smith, Irene; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Fees Paid: $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Request: Dismissal, Entire Action Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • Letter Received - Comment: Letter from thrid party stating defendants do not reside at served address.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$5,001 to $10,000

    Read MoreRead Less