This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 04/09/2021 at 18:03:21 (UTC).

Puga v. O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/08/2021 Puga filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kulkarni, Sunil R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5862

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kulkarni, Sunil R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Puga, Edith Arellano

Defendants

O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC

O'Relly Auto Enterprises, LLC

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bainer, Matthew Roland

Defendant Attorneys

Boniske, Edwin Mendelson

Peterson, James Michael

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

Proof of Service: Comment: Proof of Service

Notice: Appearance

Notice: Appearance: Comment: Notice of Appearance of Counsel for Defendant O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service Summons: Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

Civil Lawsuit Notice

Civil Lawsuit Notice: Comment: 1st CMC set for 6/3/21 at 2:30pm D1; assigned to Hon. Sunil R. Kulkarni for all purposes.

Order: Deeming Case Complex

Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline: Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/SRK.

Summons: Issued/Filed

Summons: Issued/Filed:

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet:

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies): Comment: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketConference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Kulkarni, Sunil R; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Comment: (1st CMC) Proposed Wage and Hour Class Action and PAGA enforcement action. Discovery and responsive pleading deadline stayed, as of 2/8/21, when the case was deemed complex.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service - Proof of Service: Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice: Appearance - Notice: Appearance: Comment: Notice of Appearance of Counsel for Defendant O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Proof of Service Summons: Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder: Deeming Case Complex - Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline: Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/SRK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Lawsuit Notice - Civil Lawsuit Notice: Comment: 1st CMC set for 6/3/21 at 2:30pm D1; assigned to Hon. Sunil R. Kulkarni for all purposes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed - Summons: Issued/Filed:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies): Comment: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where O'REILLY AUTO ENTERPRISES DBA O'REILLY is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara