This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/21/2022 at 22:07:23 (UTC).

Protege Restaurant Partners LLC v. County of Santa Clara, et al. [JCCP 5180; Los Angeles]

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 Protege Restaurant Partners LLC filed an Other lawsuit against County of Santa Clara, JCCP 5180 Los Angeles. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9319

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Protege Restaurant Partners LLC

Defendants

County of Santa Clara Department of Environmental Health

California Department of Alcoholic Beverage Control

County of Santa Clara

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Interested Parties

County Of Los Angeles

County Of Monterey

County Of San Francisco

County Of Sonoma

County Of Contra Costa

County Of San Diego

County Of Riverside

County Of Orange

COUNTY OF SACRAMENTO

County Of Placer

Los Angeles County Department of Public Health

Orange County Health Care Agency

County of Sacramento Environmental Management Department

County Of San Bernardino

OSF International, Inc.

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian Stephen Kabateck

Timothy Gordon Blood

Defendant Attorney

Kenneth Charles Jones

Interested Party Attorneys

Thomas Joseph Faughnan

Andrew P Baum

Amber Hanna

Wayne Kessler Snodgrass

Sara Jennifer Eisenberg

Michael George Colantuono

Matthew Christopher Slentz

Joshua Michael Heinlein

Marianne VanRiper

Laura Dianne Knapp

Lisa Ann Travis

Deborah Jean Fox

Margaret Wieland Rosequist

Matthew Bryan Nazareth

Michael L Wroniak

3 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Order: Deeming Case Complex

4/9/2021 Order: Deeming Case Complex

Civil Lawsuit Notice

4/9/2021 Civil Lawsuit Notice

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/9/2021 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

4/9/2021 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Summons: Issued/Filed

4/9/2021 Summons: Issued/Filed

Acknowledgement/Receipt

5/5/2021 Acknowledgement/Receipt

Notice

5/11/2021 Notice

Clerk Rejection Letter

5/11/2021 Clerk Rejection Letter

Notice: Entry of Order

6/28/2021 Notice: Entry of Order

Notice

8/2/2021 Notice

Notice

8/10/2021 Notice

Notice

8/24/2021 Notice

Notice

8/24/2021 Notice

Response/Reply

9/1/2021 Response/Reply

Notice

10/6/2021 Notice

Statement: Case Management Conference

11/9/2021 Statement: Case Management Conference

Notice: Entry of Order

11/15/2021 Notice: Entry of Order

Notice

11/16/2021 Notice

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2022
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 3; Time: 2:30PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Filed By: Superior Court of California,; Comment: CMC reset from 11/24/21 to 3/9/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Entry of Order; Filed By: Protege Restaurant Partners LLC,; Comment: Order Assigning Coordination Trial Judge [JCCP]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Comment: Defendant County of Santa Clara's Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Filed By: Protege Restaurant Partners LLC,; Comment: Notice of Ruling on Petition for Coordination

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Response/Reply; Filed By: California Department of Alcoholic Beverage Control,; Comment: Response to Petition for Coordination; Declaration of Kenneth C. Jones

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Filed By: California Department of Alcoholic Beverage Control,; Comment: Notice of Potential Add-On Cases for Coordination; Kenneth C. Jones Declaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Filed By: Protege Restaurant Partners LLC,; Comment: of Order Assigning Coordination Motion Judge and Setting Date for Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Comment: CMC reset from 8/4/21 to 11/24/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation and Order; Filed By: Protege Restaurant Partners LLC,; Comment: Stipulation & Order to Stay Defendants' Responses to Complaint - signed/PML.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Entry of Order; Filed By: Protege Restaurant Partners LLC,; Comment: Notice of Order Deeiming Case Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Clerk Rejection Letter; Filed By: Protege Restaurant Partners LLC,; Comment: Ntc of Submissin of Petition for Coordination - attorney must E-File.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Filed By: Protege Restaurant Partners LLC,; Comment: Notice of Submission of Petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Acknowledgement/Receipt; Filed By: Protege Restaurant Partners LLC,; Comment: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Protege Restaurant Partners LLC,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Protege Restaurant Partners LLC,; Comment: Proposed Class Action Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Protege Restaurant Partners LLC,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Lawsuit Notice; Comment: 1st CMC set for 8/4/21 at 2:30pm D3; assigned to Hon. Patricia M. Lucas for all purposes.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order: Deeming Case Complex; Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/PML.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less