This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/23/2022 at 10:50:11 (UTC).

PROTECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY vs RYKER SF, INC

Case Summary

On 12/29/2021 PROTECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RYKER SF, INC. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2816

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROTECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

RYKER SF, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ron Chow

 

Court Documents

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

12/29/2021 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/29/2021 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

12/29/2021 Summons: Issued/Filed

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

2/1/2022 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2022
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 7; Time: 2:15PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: PROTECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: PROTECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: PROTECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: PROTECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY,

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROTECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHOW RON