This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/14/2022 at 01:17:06 (UTC).

Procon Professional Contractors, Inc. vs GDK Enterprise LLC

Case Summary

On 12/13/2011 Procon Professional Contractors, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GDK Enterprise LLC. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************4871

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

URI Refrigerations, Inc.

Claimant

Bay Wide Glass, Inc.

Defendant

American Contractors Indemnity Company

Cross Plaintiff

Procon Professional Contractors, Inc.

Cross Defendants

URI Refrigeration, Inc.

Jo Faith Barnett

Dale Barnett

Not Yet Classified

Biovision, Inc.

Chris's Plumbing, Inc.

GDK Enterprise LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Claimant Attorney

Leslie Aileen Baxter

Defendant Attorney

Robert John Stroj

Cross Defendant Attorneys

Dana Ray Corey

Jason Lewis Pintar

Mariam KhalidJalil

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Matthew Joseph Weber

Judith J. Rentschler

Joseph Patrick Audal

Gina Elizabeth Sharron

 

Court Documents

Review: Case Status

10/11/2018 Review: Case Status

Review: Case Status

10/11/2018 Review: Case Status

Review: Case Status

10/11/2018 Review: Case Status

Review: Case Status

10/11/2018 Review: Case Status

Review: Case Status

10/11/2018 Review: Case Status

Review: Case Status

10/11/2018 Review: Case Status

Review: Case Status

4/11/2019 Review: Case Status

Review: Case Status

4/11/2019 Review: Case Status

Review: Case Status

4/11/2019 Review: Case Status

Review: Case Status

4/11/2019 Review: Case Status

Review: Case Status

4/11/2019 Review: Case Status

Review: Case Status

4/11/2019 Review: Case Status

Review: Case Status

4/11/2019 Review: Case Status

Review: Case Status

4/11/2019 Review: Case Status

Response/Reply

7/3/2019 Response/Reply

Minute Order

4/11/2019 Minute Order

Minute Order

10/12/2018 Minute Order

Minute Order

10/12/2018 Minute Order

57 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Response/Reply; Filed By: Chris's Plumbing, Inc.,; Comment: Response to OSC re Failure to Appear

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Review: Case Status; Department: Department 6; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Continued: Court's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Review: Case Status; Department: Department 2; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: Chris's Plumbing, Inc.,; Comment: Partial, Without Prejudice, Re: Case# 2012-1-CV-219816, as to the Complaint ONLY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Review: Case Status; Department: Department 19; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Continued: Court's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
132 More Docket Entries
  • 03/07/2012
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Procon Professional Contractors, Inc., GDK Enterprise LLC, Biovision, Inc., Jo Barnett, Dale Barnett,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 03/07/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2012
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Procon Professional Contractors, Inc., GDK Enterprise LLC, Biovision, Inc.,; Comment: Text = atty rentschler Legacy Name = CV Answer, Unltd, w/fees Decision = M Closed = 03/07/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2011
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Lis Pendens; Filed By: Procon Professional Contractors, Inc.,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Lis Pendens Decision = M Closed = 12/22/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2011
  • DocketDescription: Complaint: Amended; Filed By: Procon Professional Contractors, Inc., GDK Enterprise LLC, Biovision, Inc.,; Comment: ***Stricken per Order filed 2-28-17** Legacy Name = CV 1st Amended Complaint Decision = M Closed = 12/15/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2011
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Procon Professional Contractors, Inc., GDK Enterprise LLC, Biovision, Inc.,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Issued Decision = M Closed = 12/15/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2011
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Procon Professional Contractors, Inc., GDK Enterprise LLC, Biovision, Inc.,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 12/15/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2011
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2011
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Procon Professional Contractors, Inc., GDK Enterprise LLC,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 12/13/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2011
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Procon Professional Contractors, Inc., GDK Enterprise LLC,; Comment: ***CompLaint is Stricken per Order filed 2-28-17*** Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued Decision = M Closed = 12/13/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2011
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Procon Professional Contractors, Inc., GDK Enterprise LLC,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 12/13/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less