This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 11:12:44 (UTC).

Prashant Meshram vs Neha Bhagat

Case Summary

On 10/23/2017 Prashant Meshram filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Neha Bhagat. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Huber, Joseph H.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4369

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Huber, Joseph H.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Meshram, Prashant

Respondent

Bhagat, Neha

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Hutcheson, Kevin Scott

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Huber, Joseph H.; Judgment Type: Judgment/order (FL); Party: Names: Meshram, Prashant; Bhagat, Neha

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • Notice: Withdrawal of Attorney of Record - Comment: Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Comment: jgmt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Judgment: Notice of Entry (Family)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Judgment: Dissolution/Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • Hearing: Other - Judicial Officer: Huber, Joseph H.; Hearing Time: 9:15 AM; Result: Matter Heard; Comment: Prove-Up Hrg. s/f 07/24/18 m.o.-sgr;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • Conference: Status - Judicial Officer: Huber, Joseph H.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Matter Heard; Comment: (p) atty-

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • Notice: Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2018
  • Declaration: Property - Comment: separate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • Declaration: Property - Comment: community

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • Request: Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed - Comment: POS FL 100, 110, 120; FL notice alt dis resolution options

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary) - Comment: P's Prelim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • Other - Comment: Family Law Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • Petition: Dissolution no minor - Comment: Petition: Dissolution no minor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • Petition: Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less