This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/13/2022 at 10:44:51 (UTC).

Powell, et al. v. Santa Clara Valley Water District, et al.

Case Summary

On 03/23/2018 Powell, filed an Other lawsuit against Santa Clara Valley Water District,. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5346

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Norwita Powell

Preston Powell

Defendants

Santa Clara Valley Water District

City of San Jose

Other

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeffrey B Hare

 

Court Documents

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies):

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet: Comment: COMPLEX

Summons: Issued/Filed

Summons Issued Filed:

Order

Order & Notice of Reassignment of Case to Dept 19: Comment: Order & Notice of Reassignment of Case to Dept 19, Hon. Peter H. Kirwan presiding - signed/TCZ

Notice

Notice CMC reset to 6-8-18 at 10am in D19: Comment: CMC reset to 6/8/18 at 10am in D19

Complaint: Amended

Complaint Consolidated First Amended: Comment: Consolidated First Amended Complaint

Notice

Notice CMC 10-5-18 at 10am in D19: Comment: CMC set for 10/5/18 at 10am in D19 (16 related cases)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2018
  • DocketConference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint: Amended - Complaint Consolidated First Amended: Comment: Consolidated First Amended Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Notice CMC 10-5-18 at 10am in D19: Comment: CMC set for 10/5/18 at 10am in D19 (16 related cases)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketConference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: (1st CMC)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Notice CMC reset to 6-8-18 at 10am in D19: Comment: CMC reset to 6/8/18 at 10am in D19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Order & Notice of Reassignment of Case to Dept 19: Comment: Order & Notice of Reassignment of Case to Dept 19, Hon. Peter H. Kirwan presiding - signed/TCZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed - Summons Issued Filed:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet: Comment: COMPLEX

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies):

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hare, Jeffrey B