This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/19/2018 at 21:40:54 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC vs N. Freitas

Case Summary

On 08/14/2014 Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against N Freitas. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Overton, Carol, Zayner, Theodore C, Huber, Joseph H., Lucas, Patricia M and Shapero, Kenneth L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************8333

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Overton, Carol

Zayner, Theodore C

Huber, Joseph H.

Lucas, Patricia M

Shapero, Kenneth L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc

Defendants

Ninette Freitas

Freitas, Ninette

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kristen L. Brinkerhoff

4330 La Jolla Village Dr., Suite 310

San Diego, CA 92122

Brinkerhoff, Kristen L.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Names: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC; Freitas, Ninette; Comment: w/o Prejudice (Emily D. Pierce)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • Hearing: OSC Sanctions CRC 3.740 Judgment - Original Type: Hearing: OSC Sanctions CRC 3.740 Judgment; Judicial Officer: Lucas, Patricia M; Hearing Time: 10:15 AM; Result: Vacated: settled; Comment: Text = Failure to Obtain Default Judgment. Failure to Appear at OSC will Result in Dismissal of Action. Result By = C Result Judge = JH - Huber, Joseph Result Date = 09/16/2015 Log Note Text = {EvtCD=C422; Jdg=491; Clk=370; HdrDtm=2015/09/17 0836pm; Notes=none; },

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • Notice: Settlement - Judicial Officer: Huber, Joseph H.; Comment: Text = ATTY EMILY D. PIERCE; CONDITIONAL 8-1-16 Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Settlement Decision = M Closed = 09/16/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • Order: Default Judgment not entered - Judicial Officer: Huber, Joseph H.; Comment: Text = The facts stated in the Decl 585 are not with personal knowledge of the declarant. The original promissory note ,contract is required. If the original is cannot be produced an affidavit of lost instrument is necessary. See file for details. Granted by Judge Manoukian. Legacy Name = CV Ord:Rejection Letter Decision = M Closed = 04/01/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2014
  • Declaration: CCP 585 - Judicial Officer: Huber, Joseph H.; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Decl:CCP585 Decision = M Closed = 12/30/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2014
  • Declaration: CCP 1033 - Judicial Officer: Huber, Joseph H.; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Decl:CCP1033 Decision = M Closed = 12/30/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2014
  • Declaration - Judicial Officer: Huber, Joseph H.; Comment: Text = re lost original contract Legacy Name = CV Declaration Decision = M Closed = 12/30/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2014
  • Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Huber, Joseph H.; Comment: Text = as to Does 1-25 only Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial W/O Prej Decision = M Closed = 12/30/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2014
  • Default Entered - Judicial Officer: Huber, Joseph H.; Comment: Text = court Legacy Name = CV Default Entered Decision = M Closed = 12/30/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2014
  • Notice: Reassignment of Case - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Reassignment of Case Decision = M Closed = 10/10/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2014
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Shapero, Kenneth L; Comment: Text = personal Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 09/16/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2014
  • Declaration - Judicial Officer: Shapero, Kenneth L; Comment: Text = re: reduced filing fees Legacy Name = CV Declaration Decision = M Closed = 08/14/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2014
  • Complaint (Limited): Filed by Assignee <$5K - Judicial Officer: Shapero, Kenneth L; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complaint Ltd/reduced fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2014
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Shapero, Kenneth L; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 08/14/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Judicial Officer: Shapero, Kenneth L; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 08/14/2014

    Read MoreRead Less