This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/25/2019 at 23:54:48 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC vs M. Vazmendes

Case Summary

On 06/19/2014 Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against M Vazmendes. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Elfving, William J, McGowen, Beth and Shapero, Kenneth L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************8236

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Elfving, William J

McGowen, Beth

Shapero, Kenneth L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc

Defendants

Marco Vazmendes

Vazmendes, Marco

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Emily Pierce

4330 La Jolla Village Dr., Suite 310

San Diego, CA 92122

Pierce, Emily

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court (CV); Party: Name: Vazmendes, Marco; Party: Name: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court (CV); Party: Name: Vazmendes, Marco; Comment: dispositiveflag=NO;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC; Comment: dispositiveflag=NO;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC; Judgment Amount: $5,562.04; And Attorney Fees: $0.00; Awarded Against: Vazmendes, Marco; Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Costs: $0.00; Other: $5,562.04; Total: $5562.04; Comment: printdate=Jan 22 2015; freetext=$5,562.04; possessionflag=0; printpartiesflag=1; origjudgdate=Jan 22 2015; judgstatusdate=Jan 22 2015; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=09LT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2015
  • Judgment: Default - Judicial Officer: McGowen, Beth; Comment: Text = $5,562.04 Legacy Name = CV Judgment After Default Decision = G Closed = 01/22/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2015
  • Order - Judicial Officer: McGowen, Beth; Comment: Text = accepting copies in lieu of originals Legacy Name = CV Order Decision = G Closed = 01/22/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2014
  • Declaration: CCP 585 - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Decl:CCP585 Decision = M Closed = 12/10/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2014
  • Declaration: Supplemental - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Comment: Text = in suppt of default Legacy Name = CV Supplemental Declaration Decision = M Closed = 12/10/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2014
  • Declaration - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Comment: Text = re: lost original contract Legacy Name = CV Declaration Decision = M Closed = 12/10/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2014
  • Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Comment: Text = as to does 1-25 Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial W/O Prej Decision = M Closed = 12/10/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2014
  • Default Entered - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Comment: Text = court Legacy Name = CV Default Entered Decision = M Closed = 12/10/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2014
  • Notice: Reassignment of Case - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Reassignment of Case Decision = M Closed = 10/10/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2014
  • Declaration: Re: Diligence - Judicial Officer: Shapero, Kenneth L; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Decl:Diligence Decision = M Closed = 08/06/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2014
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Shapero, Kenneth L; Comment: Text = sub served Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 08/06/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Judicial Officer: Shapero, Kenneth L; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 06/19/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2014
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Shapero, Kenneth L; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 06/19/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2014
  • Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K - Judicial Officer: Shapero, Kenneth L; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Iss <$10k Decision = M Closed = 06/19/2014

    Read MoreRead Less