This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/01/2023 at 10:18:43 (UTC).

Pineda v. Super Clean Custodial, LLC, et al. (Class Action/PAGA)

Case Summary

On 10/31/2022 Pineda filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Super Clean Custodial, LLC, Class Action/PAGA. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5663

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Leonarda Pineda

Defendants

Super Clean Custodial, LLC

Clean Site Environmental Services, LLC

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scott Ernest Wheeler

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Civil Lawsuit Notice

10/31/2022 Civil Lawsuit Notice

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/31/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

10/31/2022 Summons: Issued/Filed

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

10/31/2022 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Order: Deeming Case Complex

11/1/2022 Order: Deeming Case Complex

Proof of Service: Personal

11/17/2022 Proof of Service: Personal

Proof of Service: Personal

11/17/2022 Proof of Service: Personal

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2023
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 19; Time: 2:30PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Personal; Filed By: Leonarda Pineda,; Comment: Proof of Service Personal Super Clean

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Personal; Filed By: Leonarda Pineda,; Comment: Proof of Service Personal Clean Site

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order: Deeming Case Complex; Filed By: Superior Court of California,; Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/PML.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Leonarda Pineda,; Comment: Class Action and PAGA Representative Action Complaint + Complex Fee paid by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Leonarda Pineda,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Leonarda Pineda,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet * Complex * Class Action/PAGA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Lawsuit Notice; Comment: 1st CMC set for 3/22/23 at 2:30pm in D3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara