Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 04/08/2021 at 17:13:59 (UTC).

PHUOC TRUONG vs WATLOW ELECTRIC MANUFACTURING COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/17/2020 PHUOC TRUONG filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against WATLOW ELECTRIC MANUFACTURING COMPANY. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Mikkelsen, Laurie and Barrett, Thang N. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2069

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Mikkelsen, Laurie

Barrett, Thang N

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TRUONG, PHUOC

on behalf of himself and all "aggrieved employees" pursuant to Labor Code 2698 et seq.

Defendant

WATLOW ELECTRIC MANUFACTURING COMPANY

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gaines, Kenneth Steven

Defendant Attorney

Juvinall, Kate

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Order

Order Granting Stipulation for Consolidation: Comment: Order Granting Stipulation for Consolidation - signed/BCW.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketConference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Barrett, Thang N; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: C/F 9-8-20. CMC OFF CALENDAR. Matter consolidated INTO Lead Case No. 20CV365250, by stipulation & order entered 10/19/20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Order Granting Stipulation for Consolidation: Comment: Order Granting Stipulation for Consolidation - signed/BCW.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketStatement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketConference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Barrett, Thang N; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order - Comment: Joint Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference; and Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketStatement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketAnswer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: Answer to Complaint; Atty: Juvinall

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketConference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Mikkelsen, Laurie; Hearing Time: 3:45 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketClerk Rejection Letter - Comment: Your document requires proper caption page. The documents MUST be on adopted Judicial Council forms.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketComplaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Watlow Electric Manufacturing Company is a litigant

Latest cases where on behalf of himself and all members of the putative class is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of California is a litigant