This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/18/2019 at 00:08:37 (UTC).

Philip Wilson vs Valley Crest Landscaping Companies et al

Case Summary

On 05/13/2016 Philip Wilson filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Valley Crest Landscaping Companies. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Arand, Mary E, Stoelker, James L and Strickland, Elizabeth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5129

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Arand, Mary E

Stoelker, James L

Strickland, Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wilson, Philip

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Valley Crest Landscaping Companies

Paniagua, Malinda

Valleycrest Landscape Maintenance, Inc.

Brightview Landscapes, LLC

Defendant and Cross Defendant

Paniagua, Malinda

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Krolikowski, Adam J.

Howard, Vincent D

Kim, Daniel

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

Clinton, David A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2019
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Judgment Type: Dismissal - After Court-Ordered Mediation (CV); Party: Names: Wilson, Philip; Valley Crest Landscaping Companies; Brightview Landscapes, LLC; Paniagua, Malinda; Comment: entire with prejudice by attys Howard and Clinton

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • Hearing: Dismissal after settlement - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: entire with prejudice by attys Howard and Clinton

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: No special or telephonic appearance for Plt's counsel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Notice: Settlement - Comment: Notice: Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • Affidavit: Proof of Publication - Comment: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • Statement: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
59 More Docket Entries
  • 09/06/2016
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • Statement: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • Statement: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable) - Comment: $150 jury fee deposited.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: against plt Wilson Atty Clinton

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less