This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 08:16:03 (UTC).

Phat Hin et al vs Charles Peevyhouse

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 Phat Hin filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Charles Peevyhouse. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stoelker, James L and Kulkarni, Sunil R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1837

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stoelker, James L

Kulkarni, Sunil R

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Hin, Phat Dat

Hin, Lay Dat

Defendants

Peevyhouse, Charles Melvin

Peevyhouse, Charles

Not Classified By Court

Neutral Ronald D. Digesti

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shin, Andrew Bo-Kyun

Defendant Attorney

Jungwirth, Daniel J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2019
  • Hearing: Dismissal after settlement - Judicial Officer: Kulkarni, Sunil R; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Jury Trial: Long Cause - Judicial Officer: Kulkarni, Sunil R; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Est. 3-4 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • Conference: Settlement Jury - Judicial Officer: Kulkarni, Sunil R; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • Notice: Settlement - Comment: HRG 06/05/2019 Notice of Settlement of Entire Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Conference: Trial Setting - Judicial Officer: Kulkarni, Sunil R; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Set for S/C and Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Notice: Change Address/Firm Name - Comment: Notice of Change of Firm Name

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Review: Civil Early Settlement Conf Status - Original Type: Review: Civil Early Settlement Conf Status; Judicial Officer: Stoelker, James L; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: cont. from 08-30-18 - Neutral: Ron Digesti/Hrg. 10-03-18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • Review: Civil Early Settlement Conf Status - Original Type: Review: Civil Early Settlement Conf Status; Judicial Officer: Stoelker, James L; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Parties Stipulate to Neutral Ronald Digesti: Hrg. 10-03-18

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/08/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • Answer (Limited): Up to $10K - Comment: Answer to Complaint, atty: Jungwirth

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Conference: Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Case Management; Judicial Officer: Stoelker, James L; Hearing Time: 2:15 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Charles Melvin Peevyhouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • Notice: Change Address/Firm Name - Comment: Notice of Change of Address??

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less