This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 05/12/2023 at 18:03:43 (UTC).

Pham v. Warby Parker, Inc., et al. (Class Action)

Case Summary

On 03/13/2023 Pham filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Warby Parker, Inc , Class Action. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Other - Transferred.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2400

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cindy Pham

Defendants

Warby Parker Inc.

Warby Parker Retail, Inc.

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew Warren Gordon

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/13/2023 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

3/13/2023 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Summons: Issued/Filed

3/13/2023 Summons: Issued/Filed

Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)

3/16/2023 Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)

Order: Deeming Case Complex

3/20/2023 Order: Deeming Case Complex

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

3/24/2023 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

3/24/2023 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Notice

4/19/2023 Notice

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Filed By: Warby Parker Inc., Warby Parker Retail, Inc.,; Comment: Notice of Filing Removal of Class Action to Federal Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Cindy Pham,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons - Warby Parker Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Cindy Pham,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons - Warby Parker Retail, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order: Deeming Case Complex; Filed By: Superior Court of California,; Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/TCZ.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable); Filed By: Cindy Pham,; Comment: Notice of Deposit of Advance Jury Fee by Plaintiff Cindy Pham

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Cindy Pham,; Comment: Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Cindy Pham,; Comment: Class Action Complaint + Complex Fee paid by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Cindy Pham,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet * Complex * Class Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less