This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 09:54:03 (UTC).

Petersen Vs Than

Case Summary

On 05/02/2005 Petersen filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Than. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Grilli, Mary Ann, Murphy, Kevin J, Elfving, William J, Martin, William F, Strickland, Elizabeth, Walsh, Brian C and Ward, Gregory H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************0361

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2005

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Grilli, Mary Ann

Murphy, Kevin J

Elfving, William J

Martin, William F

Strickland, Elizabeth

Walsh, Brian C

Ward, Gregory H

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Amy Petersen

Amy Sines

Lindsay Hall

Jessica Galvez

Rebecca Mitchell

Jennifer Kooman

Tami Hayes

Petersen, Amy

Sines, Amy

Galvez, Jessica

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

X

Cn Spa Manufacture Of Cananda

Rainbow Beauty Supply, Inc.

Than, Tina Thu

Nails National

Than, Tamie

Rainbow Formica Designer

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Cn Spa Manufacture Of Cananda

Rainbow Beauty Supply, Inc.

A&Y Beauty Supply

Tully Beauty Supplies, Inc.

Aly Investment Group, Llc Dba A&y Beauty Supply

14 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert H. Bohn, Jr.

152 North Third Street, Suite 200

San Jose, CA 95112

Bohn, Robert H., Jr.

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

John S. Simonson

203 Redwood Shores Pkwy., Suite 480

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

Law Office Of J. Brian Watkins

150 E. Meda Ave., Suite 220

Glendora, CA 91741

The Biernat Law Group

Mezzetti, II, Robert L.

Glaspy, Thomas P.

Simonson, John S.

Newcomb Law Offices

Capabianco, Jennifer J.

Selman Breitman LLP

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Glaspy, Thomas P.

Simonson, John S.

Other Attorneys

Robert L. Mezzetti, Ii

31 East Julian Street

San Jose, CA 95112

Thomas P. Glaspy

1550 The Alameda, Suite 200

San Jose, CA 95126-2325

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2008
  • Request: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Murphy, Kevin J; Comment: Text = As to the Complaint filed by atty Robert Bohn Jr. Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial Decision = M Closed = 07/25/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2008
  • Request: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Murphy, Kevin J; Comment: Text = with prejudice xcomplt filed by Tully Beauty Supply Inc Atty. Budra Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial Decision = M Closed = 02/11/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2008
  • Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS - Judicial Officer: Murphy, Kevin J; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Entry of Dismissal w/POS Decision = M Closed = 02/07/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2008
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Murphy, Kevin J; Comment: Text = Atty Geroge Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement Decision = M Closed = 02/06/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2008
  • Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS - Judicial Officer: Murphy, Kevin J; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Entry of Dismissal w/POS Decision = M Closed = 02/05/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2008
  • Request: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Murphy, Kevin J; Comment: Text = with prejudice xcomplt of Tamie Than, dba Nails National and Xcomplt of Tina Thu Than agst Aly Investment Group LLL dba A&Y Beauty Supply Aty Atty. Biggee Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial Decision = M Closed = 02/04/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2008
  • Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS - Judicial Officer: Murphy, Kevin J; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Entry of Dismissal w/POS Decision = M Closed = 01/29/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2008
  • Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS - Judicial Officer: Murphy, Kevin J; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Entry of Dismissal w/POS Decision = M Closed = 01/25/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2008
  • Request: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Murphy, Kevin J; Comment: Text = with prej xcomplt by Atty. Glaspy Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial Decision = M Closed = 01/25/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2008
  • Request: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Murphy, Kevin J; Comment: Text = with prejudice xcomplt filed by Rainbow Beauty Supply Inc agst Aly Investment Group, LLC, dba A&& Nails Beauty Atty. Galspy Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial Decision = M Closed = 01/18/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
99 More Docket Entries
  • 08/04/2005
  • Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Martin, William F; Comment: Text = by Atty. Bohn, Jr Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial W/O Prej Decision = M Closed = 08/08/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2005
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Judicial Officer: Martin, William F; Comment: Text = Simonson Legacy Name = CV Answer, Unltd, w/fees Decision = M Closed = 07/27/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2005
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Martin, William F; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 07/20/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2005
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Martin, William F; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 07/08/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2005
  • Complaint: Amendment To (New Party) - Judicial Officer: Martin, William F; Comment: Text = naming doe 1 as CN SPA MANUFACTURE OF CANADA naming doe 2 as TULLY BEAUTY SUPLLY, INC. Legacy Name = CV Amend to Complaint Decision = M Closed = 06/01/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2005
  • Application and Order: Appoint Guardian ad Litem - Judicial Officer: Martin, William F; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Appl/Ord:Appt Guardian Ad Litem

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2005
  • Application and Order: Appoint Guardian ad Litem - Judicial Officer: Martin, William F; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Appl/Ord:Appt Guardian Ad Litem

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2005
  • Application and Order: Appoint Guardian ad Litem - Judicial Officer: Martin, William F; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Appl/Ord:Appt Guardian Ad Litem

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2005
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Judicial Officer: Martin, William F; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued Decision = M Closed = 05/02/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2005
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Judicial Officer: Martin, William F; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 05/02/2005

    Read MoreRead Less