This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 09/13/2019 at 07:05:31 (UTC).

Perrie Hord vs Phillip Hord

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 Perrie Hord filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Phillip Hord. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Weinstein, Joshua. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3887

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Weinstein, Joshua

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Hord, Perrie Fox

Claimants

Principal Life Insurance Co SEP IRA, Phillip M Hord

Empower Retirement Traditional IRA

Cisco Systems, Inc. 401 (k) Plan

Technicolor USA, Inc. 401 (k)

Pure Storage, Inc. 401 (k) Plan

Respondent

Hord, Phillip Michael

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Vaccarezza, Loren Bryan

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2019
  • Request: Dismissal, Entire Action With Prejudice - Comment: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Notice: Case Status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Stipulation and Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Request for Order: Spousal Support - Judicial Officer: Weinstein, Joshua; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: *** $30.00 Court Reporter Fee Due *** (P) MJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Declaration: Income and Expense

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Pleading on Joinder - Employees Benefit Plan - Comment: Technicolor USA, Inc. 401 (k)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Request: Joinder - Comment: Technicolor USA, Inc. 401 (k)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Summons/Joinder - Comment: Technicolor USA, Inc. 401 (k)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Pleading on Joinder - Employees Benefit Plan - Comment: Empower Retirement Traditional IRA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Request: Joinder - Comment: Empower Retirement Traditional IRA

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2019
  • Declaration: Income and Expense

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary) - Comment: FL-140, 142, 150, 160; mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • Declaration: Income and Expense - Comment: (P)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • Request for Order (Initial) - Comment: (P) s/s

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed - Comment: petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed - Comment: (P) Petition, Summons, blank Response, UCCJEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Petition: Dissolution no minor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Petition: Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less