This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/13/2019 at 19:22:16 (UTC).

People vs Wo of Ideafarm

Case Summary

On 04/22/2017 People filed an Other lawsuit against Wo of Ideafarm. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2147

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Respondents and Interested Parties

People of the State of California

City Of Mountain View

Defendant and Appellant

Ideafarm, Wo Of

Not Classified By Court

Palo Alto Facility - Criminal

Honorable Sunil Kulkarni

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Respondent and Interested Party Attorneys

Lopez, Kaci R.

Quinn, Jannie L.

Wright, Nicole C.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2019
  • Reply Brief: Appellate - Comment: plus proof of electronic service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • Respondent's Brief - Comment: ROB, by atty Bayer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • Order - Comment: Request for extension of time to file opening brief is GRANTED and is due by 6-17-19, signed Judge Williams.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Application - Comment: Application for Extension of Time to File Brief

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Electronic Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • Clerk Rejection Letter - Comment: We are unable to change a case type because it must retain the type that it was at the time of filing. Please see CR-141-INFO for more information.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • Opening Brief: Appellant's - Comment: Plus Proof of Electronic Service, plus Application for permission for 15% word overage.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • Order - Comment: The augmented record has been filed, there is no need for an additional order concerning the preparation of the augmented record; The request for extension of time to file opening brief is GRANTED and is due by 4-19-19, signed Judge Williams.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Transcript: Reporter-Augmented/Corrected - Comment: Dated 10-21-16

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 07/23/2018
  • Transcript: Reporter-Original - Comment: Dated 11-18-16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • Transcript: Reporter-Original - Comment: Dated 3-18-16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • Affidavit - Comment: Re: Reporter's Transcript Dated 6-04-14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • Transcript: Reporter-Original - Comment: Dated 5-21-12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • Transcript: Reporter-Original - Comment: Dated 11-30-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • Clerk's Notice - Comment: of Briefing Schedule

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • Notice: Receipt of Record

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • Order - Comment: for the court to prepare record and transcripts ORDERED by Judges Weinstein and Williams

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • Notice: Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lopez, Kaci R.