This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/14/2022 at 14:48:27 (UTC).

Peninsula Security Services, Inc. vs Biovision, Inc

Case Summary

On 02/21/2012 Peninsula Security Services, Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Biovision, Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************8603

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2012

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Peninsula Security Services, Inc.

Defendant

Biovision, Inc

Not Yet Classified

Guochen Yan

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2012
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's Notice; Comment: Text = w/ntc returned to Palo Alto Small Claims Legacy Name = SCA-Ntc:Transfer of SC Matter Decision = M Closed = 07/31/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2012
  • DocketDescription: Miscellaneous: Converted Document; Comment: Peninsula Security Services, Inc. vs Biovision, In

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • DocketDescription: Judgment; Filed By: Peninsula Security Services, Inc., Biovision, Inc,; Comment: Text = Total jmt for PLT/RESP and AGAINST DEFT/APP for $1,402.36 PLUS $40.00 in costs for a sum of $1,442.36. Judge Persky Legacy Name = CV Judgment Decision = G Closed = 06/26/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2012
  • HearingDescription: Trial De Novo; Department: Department 12; Time: 8:30AM; Result: Vacated; set in error

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2012
  • HearingDescription: Trial De Novo; Department: Department 12; Time: 8:45AM; Result: Heard: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2012
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's Notice; Comment: Legacy Name = SCA-Ntc of SC Appeal Trial Decision = M Closed = 05/23/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2012
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Appeal (Small Claims); Filed By: Biovision, Inc,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Ntc of Appeal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2012
  • HearingDescription: SC Request to Correct or Vacate Judgment; Department: Department 86; Time: 1:15PM; Result: Heard: Denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2012
  • DocketDescription: Motion: Set Aside/Vacate (Small Claims); Filed By: Biovision, Inc,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Ntc:Mtn to Vacate Jgmt/Decl

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2012
  • HearingDescription: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Department: Department 86; Time: 1:00PM; Result: Heard: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2012
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: Guochen Yan,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2012
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2012
  • DocketDescription: Plaintiff's Claim-$1,500 or Less; Filed By: Peninsula Security Services, Inc.,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim $0-$1500 Decision = M Closed = 02/21/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less