This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/15/2022 at 00:41:30 (UTC).

Peninsula Security Services, Inc. vs Biovision Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/05/2012 Peninsula Security Services, Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Biovision Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************8703

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2012

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Peninsula Security Services, Inc.

Defendant

Biovision Inc.

Not Yet Classified

Gouchen Yan

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2012
  • DocketDescription: Document: Other; Filed By: Biovision Inc.,; Comment: Text = Letter from defendant dated 7/30/12 received by court 8/13/12 File transferred to DTS ATTN Judge Persky Legacy Name = SC Misc Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's Notice; Comment: Text = w/ntc returned to Palo Alto Small Claims Court Legacy Name = SCA-Ntc:Transfer of SC Matter Decision = M Closed = 06/26/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2012
  • HearingDescription: Trial De Novo; Department: Department 12; Time: 8:30AM; Result: Heard: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2012
  • DocketDescription: Miscellaneous: Converted Document; Comment: Peninsula Security Services, Inc. vs Biovision Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2012
  • DocketDescription: Judgment; Filed By: Peninsula Security Services, Inc., Biovision Inc.,; Comment: Text = Total jmt FOR PLT Peninsula Security Svcs, Inc and AGAINSET DEF Biovision, Inc for $2250.00 PLUS $60.00 costs for a sum of $2,310.00. Judge Persky Legacy Name = CV Judgment Decision = G Closed = 06/26/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2012
  • HearingDescription: Trial De Novo; Department: Department 12; Time: 8:45AM; Result: Continued: Current Month

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2012
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's Notice; Comment: Legacy Name = SCA-Ntc of SC Appeal Trial Decision = M Closed = 05/23/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2012
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Appeal (Small Claims); Filed By: Biovision Inc.,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Ntc of Appeal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2012
  • HearingDescription: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Department: Department 86; Time: 1:00PM; Result: Heard: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2012
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: Biovision Inc.,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2012
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2012
  • DocketDescription: Plaintiff's Claim-$1,501 to $5,000; Filed By: Peninsula Security Services, Inc.,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim $1501-$5000 Decision = M Closed = 04/05/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less