This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 12:50:54 (UTC).

Pazmany Brothers Landscaping Inc. vs CitiGroup Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 Pazmany Brothers Landscaping Inc filed an Other lawsuit against CitiGroup Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth and Pierce, Mark H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5935

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Pierce, Mark H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pazmany Brothers Landscaping Inc.

Defendants

CitiBank

CitiGroup Inc.

Bank of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Caspari, William Sidney

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2019
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Pierce, Mark H; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear - Judicial Officer: Pierce, Mark H; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Failure to Serve *No Special or Telephonic Appearance for Plt*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear - Judicial Officer: Pierce, Mark H; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: and failure to serve *Plt s failure to appear may result in dismissal of the case* *NO SPECIAL OR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCES**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Notice: Change Address/Firm Name

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee - Comment: 1st, atty Caspari

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: Partial w/o Prejudice as to Def Bank of America Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Pierce, Mark H; Hearing Time: 3:45 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less