This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/19/2018 at 23:13:31 (UTC).

Patrick S. Griffin And Lethu T. Vo-Griffin

Case Summary

On 08/27/2014 Patrick S Griffin And Lethu T Vo-Griffin was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Joseph, Irwin, Pennypacker, Philip H, Parker, Kimberly and Huber, Joseph H.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************2351

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Joseph, Irwin

Pennypacker, Philip H

Parker, Kimberly

Huber, Joseph H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Patrick S. Griffin

Gilroy, CA 95020

Petitioner

Griffin, Patrick S.

Defendant

Lethu T. Vo-Grifin

Respondent

Vo-Griffin, Lethu T.

Minor

Griffin, Tia E.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Kim, Deborah M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2018
  • Order: Qualified Domestic Relations - Comment: Icma, County of Santa Clara 457 deferred compensation plan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • Order: Qualified Domestic Relations - Comment: Public Employees Reitirement Law

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • Settlement Officer Conf - Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Matter Heard; Comment: Kim 8/10 both parties agree /rlg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • Stipulation & Order - No Fee - Comment: Re: attorney fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • Stipulation and Order Appointment of Pro Tem - No Fee - Comment: Sharon L Roper

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Order - Comment: to Set Aside Judgment Filed on February 6, 2017 w/pos

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • Request for Order: Mod Support - Judicial Officer: Huber, Joseph H.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Matter Heard; Comment: mod child support, property rent, spousal, p/sa

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • Stipulation and Order - Comment: Re: mod. of c/s & s/s.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • Declaration: Income and Expense - Comment: Income and Expense Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2014
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Text = (R) fw denied needs to pay $435. Legacy Name = Order on Court Fee Waiver Decision = D Closed = 09/24/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2014
  • Notice: Status Conference - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL-Ntc:Status Conference Decision = M Closed = 09/23/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2014
  • Request to Waive Court Fees (FW-001) - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = Req to Waive Court Fees Decision = M Closed = 09/23/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2014
  • Response: Dissolution - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Response DS/NL/LS Decision = M Closed = 09/23/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2014
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Uniform Custody Act Decision = M Closed = 09/23/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2014
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Text = re: Ptn, summs, blank resp. Legacy Name = FL Proof of Svc/Summons Decision = M Closed = 09/09/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2014
  • Declaration: Residence - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl of Residence Decision = M Closed = 08/27/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2014
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Uniform Custody Act Decision = M Closed = 08/27/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2014
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Summons Decision = M Closed = 08/27/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2014
  • Petition: Dissolution w/minor - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Petn:Dissol of Marriage w/Minor Decision = M Closed = 08/27/2014

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.