This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/13/2019 at 16:21:37 (UTC).

Patricia Urena vs Alberto Aurelio Vasquez

Case Summary

On 03/21/2017 Patricia Urena filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Alberto Aurelio Vasquez. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Greenwood, Mary J and Franco, Jose S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1213

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Greenwood, Mary J

Franco, Jose S

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Urena, Patricia Mary Ann

Respondent

Vasquez, Alberto Aurelio

Minors

Vasques, jr., Roman Alberto

Vasquez, Jovanna Natalia

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2019
  • Returned/Undeliverable Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary) - Comment: (P)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Request: Enter Default - Comment: (P)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Group Status Conference Calendar - Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Comment: Set for Default - LM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Findings & Order After Hearing - Comment: heard 12/3/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Comment: FL-300, FL-311, etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: re: address verification-post jgmt request to mod c/c, c/v, or c/s order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • Request for Order: Reissuance - Comment: c/f 10/25/18 to 12/3/18

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 04/20/2017
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Fee Waiver Order-Grant - Comment: (P) re: Ptn/RFO fees of $525.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Fee Waiver Application

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Request for Order: Other (Fee Applies) - Comment: (P) re: c/c, visitation, Other: Relate #16CS-150033

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Declaration: Income and Expense

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Declaration: Property - Comment: community

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Declaration: Property - Comment: separate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less