This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 12:47:30 (UTC).

Patricia Urbina vs Robert Urbina

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 Patricia Urbina filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Robert Urbina. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Emede, Julie A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3874

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Emede, Julie A

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Urbina, Patricia

Respondent

Urbina, Robert

Minor

Urbina, Isaiah

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Aguirre, Stephanie C

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2019
  • Returned/Undeliverable Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • FC 2336 Packet Received for Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Returned/Undeliverable Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Request: Enter Default - Comment: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed - Comment: AMNEDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Request: Enter Default - Comment: denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • Substitution: Attorney - Comment: (P) w/ POS by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Declaration: Property - Comment: (p) sep

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Declaration: Property - Comment: (p) comm

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/03/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Request for Order: Domestic Violence - Original Type: Request for Order: Domestic Violence; Judicial Officer: Emede, Julie A; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Matter Heard; Comment: c/f 11-02-18 min set from 18DV000722 case/sa

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Order: Restraining Order After Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Response: Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order - Comment: hrg 11/30/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • DV Continuance - Comment: c/f 11-2-18 to 11-30-18- attacjed dv-110

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Fee Waiver Order-Grant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Fee Waiver Application

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less