This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/23/2022 at 18:20:53 (UTC).

PATELCO CREDIT UNION vs ROGER YOUNG et al

Case Summary

On 11/04/2019 PATELCO CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ROGER YOUNG. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mikkelsen, Laurie. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7964

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mikkelsen, Laurie

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PATELCO CREDIT UNION

Defendants

YOUNG, ROGER O.

BRIDGEPORT FINANCIAL, INC.

ROGER O. YOUNG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Caudill, Thomas

Amanda Nichole Ferns

Defendant Attorney

Mark Ewell Ellis

 

Court Documents

Conference: Further Case Management

9/22/2020 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

9/22/2020 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

9/22/2020 Conference: Further Case Management

Summons: Issued/Filed

11/4/2019 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/4/2019 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

11/4/2019 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

1/3/2020 Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

1/21/2020 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

1/21/2020 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Statement: Case Management Conference

2/11/2020 Statement: Case Management Conference

Statement: Case Management Conference

2/18/2020 Statement: Case Management Conference

Minute Order

3/3/2020 Minute Order

Statement: Case Management Conference

5/18/2020 Statement: Case Management Conference

Statement: Case Management Conference

5/20/2020 Statement: Case Management Conference

Statement: Case Management Conference

9/1/2020 Statement: Case Management Conference

Statement: Case Management Conference

9/4/2020 Statement: Case Management Conference

Minute Order

9/30/2020 Minute Order

Stipulation and Order

10/7/2020 Stipulation and Order

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Writ: Execution (Issued); Filed By: PATELCO CREDIT UNION,; Comment: Los Angeles, $90,910.06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Writ: Execution (Issued); Filed By: PATELCO CREDIT UNION,; Comment: Santa Clara, $90,910.06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Abstract of Judgment: Issued; Filed By: PATELCO CREDIT UNION,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Entry of Order; Filed By: PATELCO CREDIT UNION,; Comment: Notice: Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Judgment: Stipulated; Filed By: PATELCO CREDIT UNION, ROGER YOUNG, BRIDGEPORT FINANCIAL, INC.,; Comment: $90,870.06 total, signed Judge Manoukian. [Env# 7906929]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation; Filed By: PATELCO CREDIT UNION,; Comment: Stipulation for Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: PATELCO CREDIT UNION,; Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Declaration; Filed By: PATELCO CREDIT UNION,; Comment: Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Ex Parte Application; Filed By: PATELCO CREDIT UNION,; Comment: Ex Parte Application

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: PATELCO CREDIT UNION,; Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: ROGER YOUNG, BRIDGEPORT FINANCIAL, INC.,; Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: PATELCO CREDIT UNION,; Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable); Filed By: PATELCO CREDIT UNION,; Comment: $150 jury fee deposited by Atty Caudill

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: PATELCO CREDIT UNION,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: PATELCO CREDIT UNION,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: ROGER YOUNG, BRIDGEPORT FINANCIAL, INC.,; Comment: to complaint, atty Ellis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: PATELCO CREDIT UNION,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: PATELCO CREDIT UNION,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: PATELCO CREDIT UNION,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BRIDGEPORT FINANCIAL, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where PATELCO CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ellis, Mark Ewell