This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/22/2022 at 19:51:45 (UTC).

Park v. Pandey, et al. (Nutanix, Inc.) [Consolidated into Lead Case No. 19CV351577]

Case Summary

On 08/02/2019 Park filed a Contract - Security lawsuit against Pandey, Nutanix, Inc Consolidated into Lead Case No 19CV351577. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2269

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Security

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TJ Park

Defendants

Nutanix, Inc.

Dheeraj Pandey

Duston M. Williams

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Phong Le Tran

Defendant Attorney

Ignacio Evaristo Salceda

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order

Stipulation and Order Consolidating Related Cases and Appointing Lead Counsel: Comment: Consolidating Related Cases and Appointing Lead Counsel - signed/TEK

Stipulation and Order

Stipulation and Proposed Order re Consolidation: Comment: Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Consolidating Related Cases and Appointing Lead Counsel

Proof of Service

Proof of Service: Comment: Proof of Service

Order

Order Relating Cases: Comment: Order Relating Cases - signed/TEK

Order: Deeming Case Complex

Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline: Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline signed/TEK

Notice: Related Cases

Notice of Related Case: Comment: Notice of Related Case

Civil Lawsuit Notice

Civil Lawsuit Notice: Comment: 1st CMC set for 11/15/19 at 10am in D5; assigned to Hon. Thomas E. Kuhnle for all purposes

Summons: Issued/Filed

Summons Issued Filed:

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet:

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/26/2019
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Stipulation and Order; Comment: Consolidating Related Cases and Appointing Lead Counsel - signed/TEK

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2019
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: TJ Park,; Comment: Proof of Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2019
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Order; Filed By: TJ Park,; Comment: Order Relating Cases - signed/TEK

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2019
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Order: Deeming Case Complex; Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline signed/TEK

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/06/2019
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Notice: Related Cases; Filed By: TJ Park,; Comment: Notice of Related Case

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2019
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Civil Lawsuit Notice; Comment: 1st CMC set for 11/15/19 at 10am in D5; assigned to Hon. Thomas E. Kuhnle for all purposes

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2019
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: TJ Park,

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2019
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: TJ Park,

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2019
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: TJ Park,

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2019

DocketDescription: New Filed Case

[+] Read More [-] Read Less