This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 12:51:04 (UTC).

PARK TOWNSEND HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION vs KHA LE et al

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 PARK TOWNSEND HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against KHA LE. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth and Kirwan, Peter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5938

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Kirwan, Peter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PARK TOWNSEND HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Defendants

TRAN, MAI HUONG

LE, KHA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Pratt, Sharon Glenn

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2019
  • Review: Case Status - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Comment: re: Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • OSC: Dismissal Failure to Serve - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Continued: Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Declaration - Comment: HRG 04/25/19 Declaration Of Sharon Glenn Pratt Re Order to Show Cause

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • Default Pending

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons on Defendant Mai Huong Tran

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons on Defendant Kha Le

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Continued: Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: HRG 1/15/19 Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Exhibit List (Party) - Comment: Exhibit A TO COMPLAINT PART 3 OF 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Exhibit List (Party) - Comment: Exhibit A TO COMPLAINT PART 2 OF 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Exhibit List (Party) - Comment: Exhibit A TO COMPLAINT PART 1 OF 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less