This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/07/2018 at 10:24:06 (UTC).

Parc Metropolitan Community Association vs RGCCLPO Development Co., LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 11/17/2008 Parc Metropolitan Community Association filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against RGCCLPO Development Co , LLC. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Monahan, William, Bondonno, Franklin E, Kleinberg, James P, Kirwan, Peter and Huber, Joseph H.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************7883

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Monahan, William

Bondonno, Franklin E

Kleinberg, James P

Kirwan, Peter

Huber, Joseph H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Parc Metropolitan Community Association

Defendants

Vaca Valley Roofing Inc

Fire Barrier Inc

John William Aufdermauer

San Marino Plastering Inc

Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Five Star Plumbing

Air Design, Inc.

GDH Enterprises

C K L Construction Inc

RGCCLPO Development Co., LLC

Daniel Silverie Iii, Inc.

Nally, Jack L, Jr.

American Discount Products-Fresno

D M Bishop Construction Co.

Alpine Industries, Inc.

Design Select

American Discount Products

Partner Of Hydrochem Construction, A Partnership

Capaz Constuction

Hydrochem Construction

8 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Scott William Barton

2175 N. California Blvd., Suite 500

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Barton, Scott William

Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Lawley, Elizabeth W.

Green & Hall Apc

2999 Douglas Boulevard, Suite 220

Roseville, CA 95661-4216

Huguenin, Edward R

Bybee, Robert B.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2012
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other Dismissal (CV, FL); Party: Name: Neighborhood Association Management, Inc.; Party: Name: Community Care Property Management, Inc.; Party: Name: Capaz Constuction; Party: Name: Nally, Jack L, Jr.; Party: Name: Daniel Silverie III, Inc.; Party: Name: GDH Enterprises; Party: Name: Design Select; Party: Name: D M Bishop Construction Co.; Party: Name: Air Design, Inc.; Party: Name: Hydrochem Construction; Party: Name: Davick, Lawrence Joseph, II; Party: Name: S & S Drywall Inc; Party: Name: C K L Construction Inc; Party: Name: American Discount Products; Party: Name: Alpine Industries, Inc.; Party: Name: Pacific Window Corporation; Party: Name: American Window Distributors, Inc; Party: Name: Calprop Corporation; Party: Name: RGCCLPO Development Co., LLC; Party: Name: Parc Metropolitan Community Association

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2012
  • Notice: Dismissal of Action - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Comment: Legacy Name = CV-Ntc:Dismissal of Action Decision = M Closed = 12/14/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2012
  • Hearing: Dismissal after settlement - Original Type: Hearing: Dismissal after settlement; Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard: Dismised; Comment: Text = *Telephonic Appearance by Ryan N. Meyer for Def RGCCLPO Development Co., LLC* Result By = C Result Judge = PK - Kirwan, Peter Result Date = 12/13/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2012
  • Order - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Comment: Text = of Dismissal for Failure to Appear on 12-13-12 (Signed by Judge Kirwan) Legacy Name = CV Order Decision = M Closed = 12/18/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2012
  • Request: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Comment: Text = Cross-Complaint filed by RGCCLPO Development Co., et al. on 5-25-09 (Atty. Ryan N. Meyer) Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial Decision = M Closed = 12/03/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2012
  • Jury Trial: Long Cause - Original Type: Jury Trial: Long Cause; Judicial Officer: Monahan, William; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Vacated: settled; Comment: Text = Est 3-4 Days Result By = K Result Judge = WM - Monahan, William Result Date = 10/03/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2012
  • Notice: Settlement - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Comment: Text = conditional (atty Ryan N. Meyer) Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Settlement Decision = M Closed = 10/04/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2012
  • Proof of Service: Electronic - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Comment: Text = Motion in Limine (Atty Ryan Meyer) Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc by Email Decision = M Closed = 10/02/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2012
  • Motion: In Limine - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Comment: Text = Revised Motion in Limine Index (R. Meyer) 10-01-12 D8 Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine Decision = M Closed = 10/02/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2012
  • Motion: In Limine - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Comment: Text = #6 Limitation of Trial to Material Facts Still in Dispute After the Court's Ruling on the Motion for Summary Adjud. (atty Ryan Meyer) 10-01-12 D8 Legacy Name = CV Mtn In Limine Decision = M Closed = 10/02/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
386 More Docket Entries
  • 02/10/2009
  • Motion: Other - Judicial Officer: Huber, Joseph H.; Comment: Text = EF G#13596-Ntc o fmtn and mtn to stay action pending pltff's complaince with CC Sec 910 by Atty Huguenin. 03/13/09 @9Am In D-8C. Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Motion/no fee Decision = M Closed = 02/10/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2009
  • Document: Complex Lit - Judicial Officer: Huber, Joseph H.; Comment: Text = Taken under ntc of mtn to stay action by Atty Huguenin. Legacy Name = CV Complex Fee Payment Decision = M Closed = 02/10/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2009
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Judicial Officer: Huber, Joseph H.; Comment: Text = Taken under ntc of mtn to stay action by Atty Huguenin.. Legacy Name = CV First Paper Def - Unltd Decision = M Closed = 02/10/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2008
  • Order: Deeming Case Complex - Judicial Officer: Huber, Joseph H.; Comment: Text = EF #G-12362 signed by Judge Joseph H. Huber Legacy Name = CV Order Deeming Case Complex Decision = M Closed = 12/05/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2008
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Huber, Joseph H.; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 11/17/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2008
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Huber, Joseph H.; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Issued Decision = M Closed = 11/17/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2008
  • Document: Complex Lit - Judicial Officer: Huber, Joseph H.; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complex First Paper Decision = M Closed = 11/17/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2008
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Judicial Officer: Huber, Joseph H.; Comment: Text = Scott W. Barton Legacy Name = CV Complex Complaint Decision = M Closed = 11/17/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2008
  • Complex Litigation: Provisional - Judicial Officer: Huber, Joseph H.; Comment: Text = 2, 7, 9 Legacy Name = CV Complex Lit/Provisional Decision = M Closed = 11/17/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2008
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Judicial Officer: Huber, Joseph H.; Comment: Text = complex - 2, 7, 9 Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 11/17/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DANIEL SILVERIE III, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where GDH ENTERPRISES is a litigant

Latest cases where Air Design Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where San Marino Plastering, Inc. is a litigant