This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 12/15/2021 at 14:07:02 (UTC).

PARAMOUNT GLOBAL SOLUTIONS INC. vs ANJANEYAP, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/04/2020 PARAMOUNT GLOBAL SOLUTIONS INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ANJANEYAP, INC. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4685

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PARAMOUNT GLOBAL SOLUTIONS INC.

Defendant

ANJANEYAP, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Klavdianos, Denis

Pollak, Robert L.

Denis Klavdianos

Robert L. Pollak

Defendant Attorneys

Quan, Andrew

Andrew Quan

 

Court Documents

Request: Dismissal

10/2/2020 Request: Dismissal

Answer (Limited): Up to $10K

5/22/2020 Answer (Limited): Up to $10K

Proof of Service: Mail

5/22/2020 Proof of Service: Mail

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

3/20/2020 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/4/2020 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

3/4/2020 Summons: Issued/Filed

Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K

3/4/2020 Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: PARAMOUNT GLOBAL SOLUTIONS INC.,; Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Mail; Filed By: ANJANEYAP, INC.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Limited): Up to $10K; Filed By: ANJANEYAP, INC.,; Comment: to complaint: atty Quan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: PARAMOUNT GLOBAL SOLUTIONS INC.,; Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE RE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K; Filed By: PARAMOUNT GLOBAL SOLUTIONS INC.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: PARAMOUNT GLOBAL SOLUTIONS INC.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: PARAMOUNT GLOBAL SOLUTIONS INC.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Anjaneyap, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Quan, Andrew Kassouf