Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/11/2021 at 19:08:05 (UTC).

PACIFIC COMPENSATION INSURANCE COMPANY vs RHODA QUATE et al

Case Summary

On 08/24/2020 PACIFIC COMPENSATION INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against RHODA QUATE. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Mikkelsen, Laurie and Rudy, Christopher G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9827

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Mikkelsen, Laurie

Rudy, Christopher G

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PACIFIC COMPENSATION INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

QUATE, CALVIN

QUATE, RHODA

Estate of Calvin Quate

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Johnsen, Gregory Francis

Defendant Attorney

Rivera, Christopher W.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketConference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Rudy, Christopher G; Hearing Time: 2:15 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2020
  • DocketAdvance jury fee (Nonrefundable) - Comment: $150 paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketAnswer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: To Complaint atty; Rivera

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed - Comment: AMENDED Summons on FAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketAmended Complaint Filed - No Fee - Comment: FIRST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Notice OF FILING COMPLAINT ON TO INJURED WORKER MARIO FUNES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketComplaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PACIFIC COMPENSATION INSURANCE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RIVERA, CHRISTOPHER W.