This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/16/2019 at 06:39:31 (UTC).

Pacific Bell Telephone Company vs Shimmick Construction Co., Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 01/05/2015 Pacific Bell Telephone Company filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Shimmick Construction Co , Inc . This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Zayner, Theodore C, Yew, Erica, Folan, Maureen A and Strickland, Elizabeth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************5236

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Zayner, Theodore C

Yew, Erica

Folan, Maureen A

Strickland, Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Pacific Bell Telephone Company

Precision Directional Boring, Inc.

Utiliquest, LLC

Defendant

Untiliquest, Llc

Cross Plaintiffs

Shimmick Construction Co., Inc.

Caltrain

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Rathfon, Steven D.

Asiano, Ann M.

Slaughter, William M

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

Bogdan, William A

Other Attorneys

Steven D. Rathfon

6114 Lasalle, Suite 518

Oakland, CA 94611

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Dismissal - After Other ADR (CV); Party: Name: Caltrain; Party: Name: Utiliquest, LLC; Party: Name: Precision Directional Boring, Inc.; Party: Name: Shimmick Construction Co., Inc.; Party: Name: Pacific Bell Telephone Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Entry of Dismissal w/POS Decision = M Closed = 10/01/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • Hearing: Dismissal after settlement - Original Type: Hearing: Dismissal after settlement; Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Vacated; dismissal filed; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = MAF - Folan, Maureen Result Date = 09/17/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Entry of Dismissal w/POS Decision = M Closed = 09/24/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • Request: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Comment: Text = by atty Bogdan as to cross-complaint filed 2-27-15 only *this closes the case* Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial Decision = M Closed = 09/17/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • Request: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Comment: Text = as to Cross-Complaint w/ Prejudice filed by Utiliquest LLC only (Megan C. Winter) Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial Decision = M Closed = 09/14/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • Request: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Comment: Text = Dismissed w/ Prejudice as to the Complaint Only (Steven D. Rathfon) Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial Decision = M Closed = 09/11/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • Review: Mediation Status - Original Type: Review: Mediation Status; Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Vacated: settled; Comment: Text = Mediation with Judge Yew *continued from 8-6-15 per stip/order* Result By = C Result Judge = TZ - Zayner, Theodore Result Date = 08/12/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • Notice: Settlement - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Comment: Text = unconditional Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Settlement Decision = M Closed = 08/12/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2015
  • Review: Mediation Status - Original Type: Review: Mediation Status; Judicial Officer: Yew, Erica; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Settled: at judicial arbitration; Comment: Text = Mediation w/Judge Yew Result By = C Result Judge = EY - Yew, Erica Result Date = 08/06/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2015
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Comment: Text = Cross-Complaint Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 02/19/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2015
  • Cross-Complaint - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Comment: Text = Atty Slaughter Legacy Name = CV Cross-Complaint Decision = M Closed = 02/19/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2015
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Comment: Text = Atty Slaughter 625 E. Santa Clara Street, Suite 101 Ventura, CA 93001 PH: 805-658-7800 Legacy Name = CV Answer, Unltd, w/fees Decision = M Closed = 02/19/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 02/11/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 02/11/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 02/11/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 02/11/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2015
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 01/05/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2015
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued Decision = M Closed = 01/05/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 01/05/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SHIMMICK CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where UTILIQUEST LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CALTRAIN is a litigant

Latest cases where PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant