This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 12:06:16 (UTC).

P. Wagner vs G. Lowney

Case Summary

On 06/14/2005 P Wagner filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against G Lowney. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Madden, James P and Levinger, Mary Jo. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************2449

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Madden, James P

Levinger, Mary Jo

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Paul Wagner

San Jose, CA 95130

Wagner, Paul

Defendants

Gretta Lowney

Mountain View, CA 94043

Lowney, Gretta

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2005
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Lowney, Gretta; Party: Name: Wagner, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2005
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Lowney, Gretta; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Wagner, Paul; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Wagner, Paul; Judgment Amount: $751.00; And Attorney Fees: $0.00; Awarded Against: Lowney, Gretta; Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Costs: $22.00; Other: $729.00; Total: $751.00; Comment: printdate=Jul 15 2005; origjudgdate=Jul 14 2005; judgstatusdate=Jul 15 2005; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2005
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Lowney, Gretta; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Wagner, Paul; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2005
  • Clerk's Notice - Judicial Officer: Levinger, Mary Jo; Comment: Text = with notice returned to small claims court. Legacy Name = SCA-Ntc:Transfer of SC Matter Decision = M Closed = 10/07/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2005
  • Trial De Novo - Original Type: Trial De Novo; Judicial Officer: Levinger, Mary Jo; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Dismissed: Appeal; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = MJL - Levinger, Mary Jo Result Date = 09/27/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2005
  • Judgment - Judicial Officer: Levinger, Mary Jo; Comment: Text = The Appellant, having failed to appear, the Appeal is Dismissed. The court dismisses the appeal and reinstates the judgment. Legacy Name = CV Judgment Decision = M Closed = 09/27/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2005
  • Clerk's Notice - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SCA-Ntc of SC Appeal Trial Decision = M Closed = 08/24/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2005
  • Notice: Appeal (Small Claims) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Ntc of Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2005
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Heard: Judgment; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = JM - Madden, James Result Date = 07/14/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2005
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2005
  • Cause Of Action - Action Complaint; File Date: 06/14/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2005
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$1,500 or Less - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff's Claim/<13,non-Gov Closed = 07/15/2005

    Read MoreRead Less