This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/14/2022 at 08:09:54 (UTC).

P. Brallier vs Market Gateway, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 01/18/2012 P Brallier filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Market Gateway, LLC. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Overton, Carol, McKenney, Kevin E and Strickland, Elizabeth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************6950

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Overton, Carol

McKenney, Kevin E

Strickland, Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Brallier, Peter J

Peter J Brallier

Defendants

Core Development, Inc.

Market Gateway, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Garvic, John D

John D Garvic

Defendant Attorneys

Cave, Thomas R.

Thomas Roy Cave

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2012
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: Peter Brallier, Market Gateway, LLC, Core Development, Inc.,; Comment: Text = (john d. garvic) Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Entire w/Prej Decision = M Closed = 12/07/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2012
  • HearingDescription: Review: Mediation Status; Department: Department 20; Time: 10:30AM; Result: Settled: at mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2012
  • DocketDescription: Notice of Hearing (no fee); Comment: Legacy Name = ARB-Ntc of Mediation Status Conf Decision = M Closed = 07/18/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2012
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Further Case Management; Department: Department 5; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Referral: Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2012
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Peter Brallier,; Comment: Text = atty garvic Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement Decision = M Closed = 07/02/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2012
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Market Gateway, LLC, Core Development, Inc.,; Comment: Text = re (Atty T. Cave) Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement Decision = M Closed = 07/02/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2012
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 20; Time: 2:15PM; Result: Set for: further CMC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2012
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Market Gateway, LLC, Core Development, Inc.,; Comment: Text = atty Cave Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement Decision = M Closed = 05/29/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2012
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Peter Brallier,; Comment: Text = Atty: John D. Garvic Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement Decision = M Closed = 05/24/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2012
  • DocketDescription: General Denial: Unlimited; Filed By: Peter Brallier, Market Gateway, LLC, Core Development, Inc.,; Comment: Text = atty Cave Legacy Name = CV General Denial, Unltd Decision = M Closed = 03/13/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2012
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: Market Gateway, LLC, Core Development, Inc.,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Decision = M Closed = 03/13/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2012
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Peter Brallier, Market Gateway, LLC,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 02/22/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2012
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Peter Brallier, Core Development, Inc.,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 02/22/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2012
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Peter Brallier, Market Gateway, LLC, Core Development, Inc.,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 01/18/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2012
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2012
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Peter Brallier, Market Gateway, LLC, Core Development, Inc.,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 01/18/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2012
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Peter Brallier, Market Gateway, LLC, Core Development, Inc.,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued Decision = M Closed = 01/18/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Core Development, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARVIC, JOHN D.