This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 11/25/2022 at 18:02:54 (UTC).

Organizacion Comunidad de Alviso v. City of San Jose (CEQA)

Case Summary

On 09/26/2022 Organizacion Comunidad de Alviso filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against City of San Jose CEQA. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3426

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Organizacion Comunidad de Alviso

Respondent

City of San Jose

Interested Parties

Nolan Granberry

Second Harvest of Silicon Valley

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Mark Raymond Wolfe

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Notice

9/26/2022 Notice

Petition (Unlimited) (No Fee)

9/26/2022 Petition (Unlimited) (No Fee)

Request

9/26/2022 Request

Notice

9/26/2022 Notice

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/26/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service

10/11/2022 Proof of Service

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

10/11/2022 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

10/11/2022 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

10/11/2022 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Notice

10/19/2022 Notice

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2023
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 1; Time: 2:30PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Filed By: Organizacion Comunidad de Alviso,; Comment: Notice to Responsible Agencies of Commencement of Action under CEQA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Organizacion Comunidad de Alviso,; Comment: Proof of Service on City of San Jose

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Organizacion Comunidad de Alviso,; Comment: Proof of Service on Second Harvest

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Organizacion Comunidad de Alviso,; Comment: Proof of Service on Noland Granberry

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: Organizacion Comunidad de Alviso,; Comment: Proof of Service on AG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Organizacion Comunidad de Alviso,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Filed By: Organizacion Comunidad de Alviso,; Comment: Notice of Commencement of action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request; Filed By: Organizacion Comunidad de Alviso,; Comment: to prepare record

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Petition (Unlimited) (No Fee); Filed By: Organizacion Comunidad de Alviso,; Comment: Petition for Writ of Mandate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Filed By: Superior Court of California,; Comment: CMC set for 2/16/23 at 2:30pm in D1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Second Harvest of Silicon Valley is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of California is a litigant