Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 12:07:53 (UTC).

Oportun Inc vs Rosa Medina Tamayo

Case Summary

On 01/10/2018 Oportun Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Rosa Medina Tamayo. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Smith, Irene. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2508

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Smith, Irene

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Opurtun Inc.

Oportun Inc

Defendant

Medina Tamayo, Rosa Elvira

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Smith, Irene; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Oportun Inc; Awarded Against: Medina Tamayo, Rosa Elvira; Amount; Damages: $1,428.43; Costs: $105.00; Total: $1533.43; Comment: contract is canceled.; Party: Names: Oportun Inc; Medina Tamayo, Rosa Elvira

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Smith, Irene; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Fee Paid $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Judgment: Notice of Entry (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Stipulation and Order Appointment of Temporary Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • Proof of Service: Substituted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • Request: Postponement (Small Claims) (No Fee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim-More than 12 - Comment: Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim-More than 12

    Read MoreRead Less